District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0231 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/05/2023

                    Dear Chairman Mendelson:
Sincerely,
ser
MURIEL BOWSER
MAYOR
May 5, 2023
The Honorable Phil Mendelson
Chairman
Council of the District of Columbia
John A. Wilson Building
1350Pennsylvania AvenueNW, Suite 504
Washington, DC 20004
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 8 of An Act providing for the 
zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses of 
buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other 
purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), I am pleased to 
nominate the following individual:
for reappointment as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, for a term to end September 
30, 2025. Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of Mr. Blake, 
together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent 
and Appointments, should the Council require additional information.
Mr. Carl Blake 
Crittenden Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4)
Mur e   A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Carl Blake to the Board of Zoning Adjustment.
Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of:
as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, pursuant to section 8 of An Act Providing for
the zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses28
of buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other29
purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), for a term to30
end September 30, 2025.31
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,32
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.33
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.34
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
Chainnan Phil Mendelson 
at the request of the Mayor
Mr. Carl Blake 
Crittenden Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4)
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Board of Zoning Adjustment Carl Blake Confirmation Resolution 
of 2023”.  CARL H. BLAKE, CFA
PROFESSIONAL CERTIFICATIONS
Chartered Financial Analyst (1992)
EDUCATION
MBA, Finance, Colgate Darden Graduate School of Business Administration, University of 
Virginia, Charlottesville, VA
BA, Economics, Bowdoin College, Brunswick, ME
2010 - Present, Founder/Managing Partner, Blake Properties NETT LLC, a real estate 
investment management and financial sendees consulting firm. Primarily a buy and hold investor, 
with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively managed investments focused on residential 
multi-family and mixed-use properties in The District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey and 
North Carolina. Extensive experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing 
market.
2016-2018, Managing Director, GARA Consulting and Capital responsible for analytics, 
which includes identifying and evaluating investment opportunities, structuring transactions and 
directing deal due diligence.
2010-2016, Managing Partner, CENTAURUS Greene Street provided advisory services to 
small to medium size business on strategic planning matters and capital structure optimization.
1992 - 2010, Fundamental investment research relating to all levels of the capital structure. His 
experience as a credit analyst covered a diverse set of industries including telecommunications, 
media, energy, metals and mining, chemicals, industrials and financial institutions. Prior to 
becoming a credit analyst in 1994, Carl was an equity analyst covering the telecommunications 
industry' with a focus on the RBOC, Long-distance and CLEC sectors. For eight consecutive years 
(while at Smith Barney, Lehman Brothers, and TD Securities) Carl was a senior analyst on 
research teams ranked among the top 3 by Institutional Investor. He most recently served as a 
Managing Director at Gimme Credit Publications and Senior Vice President and Group Leader of 
the High Yield Research Group at Friedman Billings Ramsey.
2014-2016, Advisor, North Avenue Research, LLC a firm comprised of renewable energy 
technology and finance veterans founded in 2012 to provide proprietary, independent research and 
due diligence support to equity and fixed income managers and to a range of clients involved in the 
renewable energy and energy' efficiency sectors.
1984- 1990, Carl began his Wall Street research career first as an analyst at Morgan Stanley and 
later at Kidder Peabody, where he also worked as an associate covering distressed credits and 
special situations.
2019 - Present, Director, Financial Planning BlueWater Group, Inc., overseeing the development of 
forward-looking quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting. These models are 
designed to minimize operational/performance risk, balance rate affordability', level of service 
requirements and optimize capital reinvestment efficiency. BlueWater is a risk management and 
financial consulting firm that develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and 
life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in the water, power and gas 
industries.  Carl Blake
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
A Ward 4 resident, Mr. Stanley has an MBA in Finance from the Colgate Darden Graduate 
School of Business Administration, at the University of Virginia, and a BA in Economics from 
Bowdoin College.
Mr. Carl Blake is Director of Financial Planning at BlueWater Group, 
Inc., where he oversees the development of forward-looking 
quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting. 
BlueWater is a risk management and financial consulting firm that 
develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and 
life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in 
the water, power, and gas industries.
★ ★ ★ 
WE ARE
WASHINGTON
Mr. Blake also serves as founder and managing Partner at Blake 
Properties NETT LLC, a real estate investment management and 
financial services consulting firm. The firm is primarily a buy and hold 
investor, with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively 
managed investments focused on residential multi-family and mixed-use properties in the 
District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey, and North Carolina. The company has extensive 
experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing market.   Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish
To:
From:
Date:
Subject:
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
★ ★ ★ 
WE ARE 
WASHINGTON
Tommy Wells, Steve Walker
Betsy Cavendish
March 30, 2023
Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Carl Blake as a Member of the
Board of Zoning Adjustment__________________________________________
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and 
found it to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 
202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681