District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0254 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/05/2023

                     	1 
                                                                                                                                          1 
                                   ______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
                             6 
 7 
 8 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 9 
_________________ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
_________________________ 13 
 14 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to provide that the five 15 
cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more after 16 
submitting a medical cannabis facility registration to the Alcoholic Beverage and 17 
Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred between 18 
November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer 19 
license. 20 
 21 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 
this resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification 23 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to increase medical cannabis product 25 
availability in the District and provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants 26 
that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration applications to the Alcoholic 27 
Beverage and Cannabis Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, (“open 28 
application period”) that scored 150 points or more be considered for a manufacturer 29 
license.  30 
(b) During the open application period for a cultivation center registration, 31 
the medical cannabis manufacturer license category did not exist in the District. Prior to 32 
March 22, 2023, a cultivation center registration was required to manufacture medical 33   	2 
cannabis products in the District. A number of cultivation center applicants that scored 34 
150 points or more applied to the Board with the intention of manufacturing medical 35 
cannabis products as part of their business plan.   36 
(c) On March 22, 2023, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2023, 37 
effective March 22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-332; 70 DCR 4303), took effect, which requires 38 
a medical cannabis business to obtain a manufacturer license to manufacture and sell 39 
medical cannabis products for resale.  40 
(d) Four of the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 41 
points or more as a result of the open application period have been designated by the 42 
Department of Small and Local Business Development as a Medical Cannabis Certified 43 
Business Enterprise with an equity impact enterprise certification subcategory. 44 
(e) With the open application period for unlicensed establishments, 45 
including retailer and internet retailer applications, beginning on November 1, 2023, it is 46 
imperative that the District increase the production and the availability of medical 47 
cannabis products in the District. Consequently, it is necessary for the Council to pass the 48 
underlying legislation on an emergency basis.  49 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 50 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis 51 
Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single 52 
reading. 53 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 54