District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0254 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/06/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-166  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 6, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to provide that the five 
cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more after submitting a 
medical cannabis facility registration to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board 
during the open application period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 
28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer license. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to increase medical cannabis product 
availability in the District and provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that 
submitted medical cannabis facility registration applications to the Alcoholic Beverage and 
Cannabis Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, (“open application period”) 
that scored 150 points or more be considered for a manufacturer license.  
(b) During the open application period for a cultivation center registration, the medical 
cannabis manufacturer license category did not exist in the District. Prior to March 22, 2023, a 
cultivation center registration was required to manufacture medical cannabis products in the 
District. A number of cultivation center applicants that scored 150 points or more applied to the 
Board with the intention of manufacturing medical cannabis products as part of their business 
plan.   
(c) On March 22, 2023, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2023, effective March 
22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-332; 70 DCR 4303), took effect, which requires a medical cannabis 
business to obtain a manufacturer license to manufacture and sell medical cannabis products for 
resale.  
(d) Four of the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more 
as a result of the open application period have been designated by the Department of Small and 
Local Business Development as a Medical Cannabis Certified Business Enterprise with an equity 
impact enterprise certification subcategory. 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
(e) With the open application period for unlicensed establishments, including retailer and 
internet retailer applications, beginning on November 1, 2023, it is imperative that the District 
increase the production and the availability of medical cannabis products in the District. 
Consequently, it is necessary for the Council to pass the underlying legislation on an emergency 
basis.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer 
Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.