June 20, 2023 Dear Chairman Mendelson: Sinci•ely, ;er r Muri ;1 Bo Maye Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. for reappointment as a physical therapy assistant licensed in the District member of the Board of Physical Therapy, for a term to end April 16, 2024. In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 209 of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-1202.09), I am pleased to nominate the following person: The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Ms. Ana Quinones Delafield Place, NW Washington, DC 20011 (Ward 4) MURIEL BOWSER OR I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA To confirm the reappointment of Ms. Ana Quinones to the Board of Physical Therapy. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Board of Physical Therapy Ana Quinones Confirmation17 Resolution of 2023”.18 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: as a physical therapy assistant licensed in the District member of the Board of Physical Therapy, pursuant to section 209 of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985,28 effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-1202.09), for a term to end29 April 16, 2024.30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.33 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 ^mairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor Ms. Ana Quinones Delafield Place, NW Washington, DC 20011 (Ward 4) ANA PATRICIA QUINONES Objective: Under the supervision of a Physical Therapist, implement physical therapy treatments and modalities. Physical Therapist Assistant- Clinical Affiliations March 2004 October 2003 June 2003 National Rehabilitation Hospital Outpatient Southern Maryland Hospital Center Calvert County- Public schools. Six weeks • Assisted children from 3 months to 17 years in various areas. • Manual intervention to facilitate normal growth and development patterns such as rolling, sitting, crawling, creeping, walking and balance. • Helped and adapted older children to participate in PE and academic classrooms Health South. Arlington VA. Outpatient. Eight weeks • Assisted with modalities such as Ultrasound and Tens • Therapeutic exercises, manual therapy and gait training. • Promoted upper and lower body rehabilitation Southern Maryland Hospital Center Sub acute rehab. Four weeks • Provided therapeutic exercises, bed mobility, transfers, gait training, case conference and weekly report June 2004 - June 2005 Nov2006-Sep 2008 Acute, Sub-acute and Outpatient care Work Experience Sep 2008 - Present 358-bed acute care facility and 25 bed subacute care. Therapy services were provided in telemetry, ICU, mental health unit, ambulatory surgery and out patient. Acute: bedside therapy for strength and functional activities. Wound care with Whirlpool and pulsed Lavage. Post-op joint replacement therapy: ambulation, gait training, bed mobility and functional activities. CVAs therapy Subacute: Treated patients either at bedside or at the therapy room mostly for orthopedic patients, CVAs., amputees, fractures, weakness and decrease in functional activities. Implemented and progressed Therapist’s POC with therapeutic exercises, bed mobility, functional activities and gait training In subacute care participated in patient’s plan of care. Education Skills Bilingual - Spanish/English Continuing Education A Sensory Approach to Treatment of the Infant, March 2005 Ergonomics and Management of Musculoskeletal Disorders, May 2006 DeVry University, Crystal City, VA Bachelor of Science Technical Management June 2006 UNITEC- Bogota, Colombia Bachelor of Science Marketing and Publicity March 1995 Northern Virginia Community College, Springfield, VA Associated of Science Degree in Physical Therapist Assistant May 2004 Nicholas Caylor Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 A Ward 5 resident, Dr. Nicholas Caylor received a Bachelor of Science in General Studies from the University of Idaho and a Doctor of Physical Therapy from the MGH Institute of Health Professions. Throughout his career, Dr. Caylor has been a passionate advocate for acute care physical therapy, specializing in critical care. He has second-authored and presented at physical therapy conferences, highlighting a method to simulate the acute care environment in a classroom environment. Dr. Caylor also represents his physical therapy department at several multidisciplinary council meetings, provides clinical instruction to Doctor of Physical Therapy GWUH students, and works with the departmental leadership to develop and implement new hospital initiatives. Dr. Nicholas Caylor DPT, PT is the lead physical therapist at George Washington University Hospital (GWUH), and current member of the District of Columbia Board of Physical Therapy. At GWUH, Dr. Caylor leads a team of 81 clinicians and support staff, while directly supervising 10 Senior Level therapists and specialists. In this role, he provides coaching, mentorship, and establishes expectations with senior and staff level therapists. Dr. Caylor also developed the COVID Functional Maintenance Program. This is a therapy driven program to evaluate and provide interventions to all medically stable individuals with SARS-CoV-2 infections. It has consistently helped to reduce the profound functional loss accompanying hospitalized patients with COVID. ★ ★ ★ WE ARE WASHINGTON ^.'9 Ana Quinones Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 A Ward 4 resident, Ms. Quinones received a Bachelor of Science in Technical Management from DeVry University and an Associate of Science in Physical Therapy from Northern Virginia Community College. Ana Quinones is a licensed physical therapy assistant at the National Rehabilitation Hospital, and a current member of the District of Columbia Board of Physical Therapy. ^7 Throughout her career, Ms. Quinones has had over fifteen years of experience working in acute, sub-acute, and outpatient care. At Calvert County Public Schools, Ms. Quinones worked extensively with infants and toddlers, utilizing manual intervention to facilitate normal growth and development patterns. She also helped older children adapt and participate in physical education and academic classrooms. At the National Rehabilitation Hospital (NRH), Ms. Quinones provides therapy services in the telemetry, ICU, mental health, ambulatory surgery, and out-patient units. This includes bedside and post-op joint replacement therapy for strength and functional activities. Prior to the NRH, Ms. Quinones worked at the Medstar Southern Maryland Hospital Center. Here, she provided various therapeutic exercises including bed mobility, transfers, gait training, case conferences, and weekly reports. ★ ★ ★ WE ARE WASHINGTON Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish To: From: Date: Subject: GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser ★ ★ ★ WE ARE WASHINGTON Tommy Wells, Steve Walker Betsy Cavendish March 7, 2023 Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Dr. Nicholas Caylor and Ana Quinones as members of the Board of Physical Therapy___________________ This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681