District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0293 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/20/2023

                    June 20, 2023
Dear Chairman Mendelson:
Sinci•ely,
;er
r
Muri ;1 Bo 
Maye
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation 
process.
for reappointment as a physical therapy assistant licensed in the District member of the Board of 
Physical Therapy, for a term to end April 16, 2024.
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 209 of the District of Columbia 
Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official 
Code § 3-1202.09), I am pleased to nominate the following person:
The Honorable Phil Mendelson
Chairman
Council of the District of Columbia
John A. Wilson Building
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004
Ms. Ana Quinones 
Delafield Place, NW 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4)
MURIEL BOWSER
OR
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
To confirm the reappointment of Ms. Ana Quinones to the Board of Physical Therapy.
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
resolution may be cited as the “Board of Physical Therapy Ana Quinones Confirmation17
Resolution of 2023”.18
Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of:
as a physical therapy assistant licensed in the District member of the Board of Physical Therapy,
pursuant to section 209 of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985,28
effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-1202.09), for a term to end29
April 16, 2024.30
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,31
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.32
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.33
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
^mairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request of the Mayor
Ms. Ana Quinones 
Delafield Place, NW 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4)  ANA PATRICIA QUINONES
Objective: Under the supervision of a Physical Therapist, implement physical therapy treatments and modalities.
Physical Therapist Assistant-
Clinical Affiliations
March 2004
October 2003
June 2003
National Rehabilitation Hospital 
Outpatient
Southern Maryland Hospital Center
Calvert County- Public schools. Six weeks
• Assisted children from 3 months to 17 years in various areas.
• Manual intervention to facilitate normal growth and development patterns such as 
rolling, sitting, crawling, creeping, walking and balance.
• Helped and adapted older children to participate in PE and academic classrooms
Health South. Arlington VA. Outpatient. Eight weeks
• Assisted with modalities such as Ultrasound and Tens
• Therapeutic exercises, manual therapy and gait training.
• Promoted upper and lower body rehabilitation
Southern Maryland Hospital Center
Sub acute rehab. Four weeks
• Provided therapeutic exercises, bed mobility, transfers, gait training, case conference 
and weekly report
June 2004 - June 2005 
Nov2006-Sep 2008 
Acute, Sub-acute and Outpatient care
Work Experience
Sep 2008 - Present
358-bed acute care facility and 25 bed subacute care. Therapy services were provided in telemetry, ICU, mental 
health unit, ambulatory surgery and out patient.
Acute: bedside therapy for strength and functional activities. Wound care with Whirlpool and pulsed Lavage. 
Post-op joint replacement therapy: ambulation, gait training, bed mobility and functional activities. CVAs therapy 
Subacute: Treated patients either at bedside or at the therapy room mostly for orthopedic patients, CVAs., 
amputees, fractures, weakness and decrease in functional activities. Implemented and progressed Therapist’s 
POC with therapeutic exercises, bed mobility, functional activities and gait training
In subacute care participated in patient’s plan of care.   Education
Skills
Bilingual - Spanish/English
Continuing Education
A Sensory Approach to Treatment of the Infant, March 2005
Ergonomics and Management of Musculoskeletal Disorders, May 2006
DeVry University, Crystal City, VA
Bachelor of Science Technical Management
June 2006
UNITEC- Bogota, Colombia
Bachelor of Science Marketing and Publicity
March 1995
Northern Virginia Community College, Springfield, VA 
Associated of Science Degree in
Physical Therapist Assistant
May 2004  Nicholas Caylor
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
A Ward 5 resident, Dr. Nicholas Caylor received a Bachelor of Science in General Studies from 
the University of Idaho and a Doctor of Physical Therapy from the MGH Institute of Health 
Professions.
Throughout his career, Dr. Caylor has been a passionate advocate for acute care physical therapy, 
specializing in critical care. He has second-authored and presented at physical therapy conferences, 
highlighting a method to simulate the acute care environment in a classroom environment. Dr. 
Caylor also represents his physical therapy department at several multidisciplinary council 
meetings, provides clinical instruction to Doctor of Physical Therapy GWUH students, and works 
with the departmental leadership to develop and implement new hospital initiatives.
Dr. Nicholas Caylor DPT, PT is the lead physical therapist at George 
Washington University Hospital (GWUH), and current member of 
the District of Columbia Board of Physical Therapy.
At GWUH, Dr. Caylor leads a team of 81 clinicians and support 
staff, while directly supervising 10 Senior Level therapists and 
specialists. In this role, he provides coaching, mentorship, and 
establishes expectations with senior and staff level therapists. Dr. 
Caylor also developed the COVID Functional Maintenance 
Program. This is a therapy driven program to evaluate and provide 
interventions to all medically stable individuals with SARS-CoV-2 
infections. It has consistently helped to reduce the profound functional loss accompanying 
hospitalized patients with COVID.
★ ★ ★
WE ARE
WASHINGTON
^.'9    Ana Quinones
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
A Ward 4 resident, Ms. Quinones received a Bachelor of Science in Technical Management from 
DeVry University and an Associate of Science in Physical Therapy from Northern Virginia 
Community College.
Ana Quinones is a licensed physical therapy assistant at the National 
Rehabilitation Hospital, and a current member of the District of 
Columbia Board of Physical Therapy.
^7
Throughout her career, Ms. Quinones has had over fifteen years of experience working in acute, 
sub-acute, and outpatient care. At Calvert County Public Schools, Ms. Quinones worked 
extensively with infants and toddlers, utilizing manual intervention to facilitate normal growth and 
development patterns. She also helped older children adapt and participate in physical education 
and academic classrooms.
At the National Rehabilitation Hospital (NRH), Ms. Quinones 
provides therapy services in the telemetry, ICU, mental health, 
ambulatory surgery, and out-patient units. This includes bedside and 
post-op joint replacement therapy for strength and functional 
activities. Prior to the NRH, Ms. Quinones worked at the Medstar 
Southern Maryland Hospital Center. Here, she provided various 
therapeutic exercises including bed mobility, transfers, gait training, 
case conferences, and weekly reports.
★ ★ ★
WE ARE
WASHINGTON    Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish
To:
From:
Date:
Subject:
GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
★ ★ ★ 
WE ARE
WASHINGTON
Tommy Wells, Steve Walker
Betsy Cavendish
March 7, 2023
Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Dr. Nicholas Caylor and Ana 
Quinones as members of the Board of Physical Therapy___________________
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 
202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681