District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0303 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/22/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
.\'I.- \'OR 
June 22, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350Pennsylvania Avenue,NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
In accordance with section 2 
of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01 
), and pursuant to section 501 of the District of Columbia 
Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act 
of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. 
Official 
Code§ 1-605.01), I am pleased to nominate the following person: 
Mr. Peter Winkler 
Upton Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20008 
(Ward 
3) 
for reappointment as a public member 	of the Public Employee Relations Board, for a term to end 
December 12, 2025. 
Enclosed 
you will find biographical information detailing the 	expenence of the above­
mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the 
confirmation process. 
I would 
appreciate the Council's earliest consideration 	of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do not hesitate to contact me, 
or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor's Office 	of Talent 
and Appointments, 
should the Council require additional information.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
at the request of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
14 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Peter Winkler to the Public Employee Relations Board. 
15 
16 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
17 resolution may be cited as the "Public Employee Relations Board Peter Winkler Confirmation 
18 Resolution of 2023". 
19 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
21 
22 	Mr. Peter Winkler 
23 	Upton Street, NW 
24 	Washington, DC 20008 
25 	(Ward 3) 
26 
27 as a public member of the Public Employee Relations Board pursuant to section 501 	of the 
28 District of Columbia Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act 	of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 
29 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-605.01), for a term to end December 12, 2025. 
30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
33  PETER WINKLER 
Experience 
Member, District of Columbia Public Employee Relations Board, 2020-present. 
The PERB oversees labor-management relations between the District 
government and labor organizations that represent its employees. The 
PERB hears cases presenting issues 
of representation, unfair labor 
practices, grievance arbitration award appeals, and standards 
of conduct. I 
have served one 3-year term as a neutral member 
of the PERB, and I have 
participated in decisions involving the full range 
of cases that come before it. 
Attorney, National Labor Relations Board, Washington, DC, 1977-2017. 
The NLRB, an independent federal agency, administers private-sector labor 
law in the United States. Initially, I worked in the Board's Appellate Court 
Branch, representing the Board before the United States Courts 
of Appeals 
and other federal courts. During that time, I became a supervisory attorney 
and then one 
of two managing supervisors in the Branch. 	In 2003, I was 
selected by a newly appointed NLRB member 
to serve as his chief counsel. 
Subsequently, I was selected by 
four successive Board members 	to serve as 
chief counsel. In that capacity, I oversaw a staff 	of about 15 attorneys and 
was intimately involved in deciding cases, writing opinions, and managing 
the 
business of the NLRB. 
Education 
University of Michigan Law School, JD Magna Cum Laude, 1977 
University 
of Chicago, MA in philosophy, 1974 
Amherst College, BA, 1973 
Community Service 
Volunteer at Washington Studio School, volunteer at Northwest Neighbors 
Village, volunteer and past officer at Temple Sinai DC. 
References 
Richard F. Griffin, Jr., attorney, Bredhoff 	& Kaiser, 202.842.2600 
Ronald Meisburg, attorney, Hunton Andrews Kurth, 202.955.1539  * * * Wt:.ARt:. 
WASHINGT ON 
oc 
Executive Office of the Mayor -Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building I 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 I Washington, DC 20004 
Peter Winkler 
Peter Winkler is a highly experienced labor relations professional 
and public administrator. He spent forty years at the National Labor 
Relations Board (NLRB) as an attorney prior 
to his retirement in 
2017. At the NLRB, he served as the chief counsel and advisor to 
five members 
of the Board. He helped decide unfair labor practice 
and representation cases that govern private-sector labor law 
in the 
United States, and 
he participated in directing the operations 	of the 
Board. 
Mr. Winkler began his service 
in the National Labor Relations 
Board's Appellate Court Branch, where 
he briefed and argued cases 
before the United States Court 
of Appeals. Mr. Winkler also 
appeared many times in U.S. District Courts, and he drafted the 
Board's briefs to the United States Supreme Court in several cases. 
A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Winkler received a Bachelor 
of Arts degree from Amherst College, a 
Master 
of Arts degree from the University 	of Chicago, and a Juris Doctor degree from the 
University 
of Michigan Law School. 
* * *  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
* * * 
wr;. ARr;. 
WASHINGTON 
IX 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
To: 
From: 
Date: 
Subject: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
Betsy Cavendish 
March 15, 2023 
Legal sufficiency review 
of Resolution nominating Peter Winkler as a member 	of 
the Public Employee Relations Board 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and 
found it to 
be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office 
of the Mayor, at 
202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
Elizabeth 
A. (Betsy) Cavendish 
'!be John A Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681