District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0311 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/29/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
June 29, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John 
A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and enactment by the Council 
of the District of Columbia are the 
"Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act 
of 2023," the "Floodplain Review Authority 
Temporary Amendment Act 
of2023," and the "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act 
of2023," along with an accompanying emergency declaration resolution. 
The legislation would repeal section 6B 
of the District of Columbia Applications Insurance 
Implementation Act, effective April 
5, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-269; D.C. Official 	Code§ 6-507), to 
allow the Mayor to continue to delegate the functions 
of that act to the Director of the 
Department 
of Energy and Environment ("DOEE"). DOEE has historically exercised the 
authority 
of the Applications Insurance Act to implement regulations relating to flood hazards 
and safety in the District, and DOEE has been identified by the Mayor as the District 
coordination agency for the National Flood Insurance Program ("NFIP"), as required by the 
Federal Emergency Management Agency. Repeal 
of section 6B will ensure that the District 
continues to maintain, and thus obtain the benefits of, its membership in the NFIP. 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
1/t:e.~ 
at the request of the Mayor 
A 
PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the District 	of 
Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation Act to repeal the direction to the 
Mayor that the functions 
of the act be delegated to the Director 	of the Department of 
Buildings. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution 
may be cited as the "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution 
of 2023". 
Sec. 2. (a) Section 
50l(b) of the Department of Buildings Establishment Act 	of 2020, 
effective April 5, 2021 (D.C. 
Law 23-269;68 DCR 1490), amended the District of Columbia 
Applications Insurance Implementation Act, effective May 26, 1976 (D.C. Law 1-64; D.C. 
Official 
Code§ 6-501 et seq.) ("Applications Insurance Act") 	by adding a new section 6B (D.C. 
Official Code § 6-507) that directs the 
Mayor to delegate the functions in the Applications 
Insurance 
Act to the Director of the Department of Buildings. 
(b) The purpose 
of the Applications Insurance Act is to implement certain elements 	of a 
flood protection program for the District, to ensure that the District meets the federal 
requirements for membership in the National Flood Insurance Program ("NFIP"). 
( c) Since 1996, the functions in the Applications Insurance Act have been delegated by 
the Mayor to the Department 
of Energy and Environment and its predecessor agencies. The 
1  33 Department of Energy and Environment is currently funded and staffed to administer the 
34 Applications Insurance Act. 
35 (d) While the Department 
of Buildings regulates the construction 	of buildings through the 
36 Construction Codes, which include flood elevation requirements, the Department 
of Energy and 
37 Environment regulates site and building development in floodplains more broadly, and 
38 specifically in accordance with the regulations and guidance 
of the Federal Emergency 
39 Management Agency ("FEMA"). 
40 (e) The District's membership in the NFIP provides benefits to the District that include 
41 guaranteed annual grants of $120,000 and more to support floodplain management, access to 
42 affordable flood insurance for District residents through the NFIP, and federal disaster relief 
43 should a flood occur in the District. 
44 (f) The Department 
of Energy and Environment has historically, pursuant to 	Mayor's 
45 Orders, exercised the authority 	of the Applications Insurance Act to implement regulations 
46 relating to flood hazards and safety in the District, and has been identified by the Mayor as the 
47 District coordination agency for the NFIP, as required by FEMA, by designating the Director 
of 
48 the Department of Energy and Environment as the Floodplain Administrator for the District, 
49 responsible for interacting with 
FEMA on the development of flood maps and implementation of 
50 FEMA guidelines related to flood hazards and safety. 
51 (g) Emergency legislation is necessary to repeal section 6B 	of the Applications Insurance 
52 Act (D.C. Official Code § 6-507), thereby clarifying that the Mayor may continue delegating the 
53 functions of the Applications Insurance Act to the Director 	of the Department of Energy and 
54 Environment. This will ensure that the District continues to maintain, and thus obtain the 
55 benefits of, its membership in the NFIP. 
2  56 Sec. 3. The Council 	of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
57 enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
58 Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Amendment Act 	of 2023 be adopted after a single 
59 reading. 
60 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
3  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
LEGAL COUNSEL DIVISION 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: Dan Emerine 
Legislative Director 
*** 
Department of Energy and Environment 
FROM: Megan D. Browder MD8 
Deputy Attorney General 
Legal Counsel Division 
DATE: June 27, 2023 
PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL 
ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION 
SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review -Draft "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment 
Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution 	of 
2023," and "Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act 	of 2023" 
(AE-23-423 B) 
This legislation would repeal a recent addition to the District 	of Columbia Applications Insurance 
Implementation Act ("Insurance Act"). 
1 
That act requires the review 	of building permit applications, 
subdivision proposals, sewage systems, and more for potential flood hazards. 
2 
The Mayor has delegated 
administration 
of the Insurance Act to your Department, 
3 
but the Council recently directed the Mayor 	to 
move that delegation to the new Department ofBuildings.
4 
This legislation would repeal that direction. 	It 
is legally sufficient. 
5 
If you have any questions regarding this memorandum, please contact Joshua Turner, Assistant Attorney 
General, Legal Counsel Division, at (202) 442-9834, or me at (202) 724-5524. 
MDB/jat 
1 
Effective May 26, 1976 (D.C. Law 1-64; D.C. Official Code § 6-50 I 	et seq.). 
2 
See D.C. Official Code§§ 6-501-6-504. 
3 
See, e.g., Mayor's Order 2007-61, dated June 	14, 2006. 
4 
Department of Buildings Establishment Act 	of 2020, § 50l(b), effective Apr. 5, 2021 (D	.C. Law 23-269; 68 DCR 4174). 
5 
The repeal of this direction would also make it unnecessary for 	us to resolve whether that direction impermissibly abridged 
the Mayor's delegation authority under the Charter. 
See D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.22(6) (authori zing the Mayor to delegate 
her functions 
to "any director of an executive department"). 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 409, Washington, D.
C. 20004 Phone (202) 724-5524 Email: megan.browder@dc.gov  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
LEGAL COUNSEL DIVISION 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: Tommy Wells 
Director 
*** 
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs 
FROM: Megan D. Browder 
Deputy Attorney General 
Legal Counsel Division 
DATE: June 27, 2023 
PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL 
ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION 
SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review -	Draft "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment 
Act of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution of 
2023," and "Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act of 2023" 
(AE-23-423 B) 
This is to Certify that 	this Office has reviewed the above-referenced draft 
legislation and found it to be legally sufficient. If you have any questions in this regard, please do 
not hesitate to call me at (202) 724-5524. 
Megan D. Browder 
2