District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0323 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/11/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-220  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue foreclosure 
protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC Homeowner 
Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and whose 
applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, 
and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of the DC 
HAF program before a foreclosure action. 
  
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this   
resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 
Coordination Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.   
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to continue a foreclosure moratorium for 
certain homeowners who applied for COVID pandemic-related funding from the DC 
Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF”) program before September 30, 2022, and whose 
applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to 
require regular application status updates be provided to those homeowners until their 
applications are resolved. 
(b) The District received $50 million in federal assistance through the American Rescue 
Plan Act to assist low- and moderate-income homeowners who experienced new or exacerbated 
financial hardships as a result of the pandemic and, in June 2022, the Department of Housing and 
Community Development (“DHCD”) opened applications for DC’s Homeowner Assistance 
Fund (“DC HAF”) program.  
(c) In June 2022, the Council extended the pandemic-related foreclosure moratorium to 
align with the opening of the DC HAF program and required homeowners to submit an 
application for DC HAF assistance to cure housing debts by September 30, 2022, to remain 
eligible for foreclosure protections beyond that initial deadline. 
(d) As of June 30, 2023, DHCD had approved 1,048 DC HAF applications but 400 
applications were still under review and awaiting potential payment, necessitating an extension 
of the foreclosure moratorium protections previously guaranteed to those homeowners who met 
the September 30, 2022, deadline for their DC HAF applications. DHCD explains that the    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
reasons for delays in processing DC HAF applications and providing payments include 
applicants’ complex requests for assistance with multiple obligations, applicants’ revisions to 
applications, financers’ need to register with DHCD, and financers’ need to verify payment 
details.  
(e) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, effective February 23, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-276; 69 DCR 
15121), is scheduled to expire on October 6, 2023.  
(f) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent any potential gap in the law and protect 
homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from DHCD.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner 
Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 be adopted after a single 
reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.