District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0344 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/11/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-210  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. to 
provide construction and related services for the installation of bicycle and pedestrian 
facilities to the Department of Transportation, and to authorize payment for the goods and 
services received and to be received under the modifications. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-
C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 
to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. to provide construction 
and related services for the installation of bicycle and pedestrian facilities to the Department of 
Transportation and authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received 
under the modifications.  
(b)  By Modification No. 15, dated February 21, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised a part of Option Year 4 
of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period February 27, 2023 through May 28, 2023, in 
the not-to-exceed amount of $999,000.  
(c)  By Modification No. 16, dated May 15, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised another part of Option 
Year 4 of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period May 29, 2023 through August 25, 
2023, at no cost to the District.  
(d)  Modification No. 17 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Year 4 for 
the period August 26, 2023 through February 26, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of 
$964,602.55, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount of Option Year 4 to 
$1,963,602.55. 
(e)  Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia Home 
Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)), as the 
contract will be in excess of $1 million during a 12-month period.      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
  (f)  Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the timely continuation of 
these vital services.  In addition, without this approval, First Choice Masonry, Inc. cannot be paid 
for goods and services provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period February 27, 2023 
through February 26, 2024. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 to 
Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.