District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0349 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/30/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
June 30, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and enactment 
by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
bill, the "Modification Nos. 
11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great 
American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 
of 2023," and the 
accompanying emergency declaration resolution. 
The legislation will approve Modification 
No. 11 and proposed Modification No. 	12 to Human 
Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to provide community dining 
and home-delivered meals to the Department 
of Aging and Community Living and authorize 
payment in the not-to-exceed amount 
of $4,077,797.58 for the period May 16, 2023 through May 
15, 2024. 
If you have any questions regarding this legislation, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, 
Chief Operating Officer at the Office 	of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759. 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation. 
Sincerely,  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request of the Mayor 
8 	A 	PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
9 
10 
11 
12 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve 
18 Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with 
19 Great American Corporation to provide community dining and home-delivered 
20 meals to Department of Aging and Community Living program participants, and 
21 to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under 
22 the modifications. 
23 
24 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 
25 this resolution may be cited as the "Modification Nos. 11 and 12 to Human Care 
26 Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment 
27 Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023". 
28 Sec. 2. (a) 
There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 11 and 
29 12 to Human Care Agreement No. CW98887 with Great American Corporation to 
30 provide community dining and home-delivered meals to Department of Aging and 
31 Community Living program participants, and to authorize 	payment for the goods and 
32 services received and to be received under the modifications. 
33 (b) 
By Modification No. 11, dated May 16, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
34 Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Aging and Community Living, exercised a  35 part of option year one of Human Care Agreement No. 	CW98887 for the period May 16, 
36 2023 through July 15, 2023 in the not-to-exceed amount 
of $679,632.93. 
37 (c) Modification No. 
12 is now necessary to exercise the remainder 	of option 
38 year one for the period July 16, 2023 through 
May 15, 2024 in the not-to-exceed amount 
39 
of $3,398,164.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for option year one 
40 to $4,077,797.58. 
41 ( d) Council approval is required by section 451 (b 	)(1) of the District of Columbia 
42 
Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-
43 204.51(b)(l)) since the modifications will increase the value 	of the contract to more than 
44 $1 million during a 12-month period. 
45 (e) Approval 
is necessary to allow the continuation 	of these vital services. 
46 Without this approval, Great American Corporation cannot be paid for goods and 
4 7 services provided in excess 
of $1 million for the period May 16, 2023 through May 15, 
48 2024. 
49 Sec. 3. 
The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the 
50 circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 
51 necessary that the Modification Nos. 	11 and 12 to Human Care Agreement No. 
52 CW98887 with Great American Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization 
53 Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
54 Sec. 
4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
2