District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0354 Introduced / Bill

Filed 07/05/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
July 5, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504 
Washington, D.C. 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and approval 
by the Council of the District of Columbia is an 
emergency bill, the "Modification Nos. 
13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. 
CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Act of 
2023," and the accompanying emergency declaration resolution. 
The legislation will approve Modification Nos. 
13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. 
CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC to provide occupational and ancillary healthcare services 
at the Police and Fire Clinic and will authorize payment for the goods and services received and 
to be received under the modifications. 
If you have any questions regarding this legislation, please have your 	staff contact Marc Scott, 
Chief Operating Officer, Office of Contracting and Procurement, at (202) 724-8759. 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation 
Enclosures  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
~~ 
~hil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
17 To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve 
18 Modification Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. CW62890 
19 with 
PFC Associates, LLC to provide occupational and ancillary healthcare 
20 services at the Police and Fire Clinic, and to authorize payment for the goods and 
21 services received and to 	be received under the modifications. 
22 
23 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 
24 this resolution may be cited as the "Modification Nos. 13, 14, 	15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 
25 to Contract 
No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC Approval and Payment 
26 Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023". 
27 Sec. 2. (a) There exists 
an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 13, 14, 
28 
15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. 	CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC to 
29 provide occupational and ancillary healthcare services at the Police and Fire Clinic, and 
30 to authorize 
payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the 
31 modifications. 
32 (b) 
By Modification No. 13, dated August 10, 2022, the Office 	of Contracting 
33 and Procurement, 
on behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised a part 	of  34 option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period August 22, 2022 through 
35 September 30, 2022 in the not-to-exceed amount 
of $1,969,094.95. 
36 (c) By Modification No. 14, dated September 29, 2022, the Office 
of Contracting 
3 7 and Procurement, on 
behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another 
38 part 
of option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period October 	1, 2022 through 
39 November 30, 2022 in the additional not-to-exceed amount 
of $3,162,272.88. 
40 (d) By Modification No. 15, dated November 30, 2022, the Office 
of Contracting 
41 and Procurement, on 	behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another 
42 part 
of option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period December 1, 2022 through 
43 December 30, 2022 
in the additional not-to-exceed amount 	of $1,602,983.96. 
44 (e) By Modification No. 
16, dated December 21, 2022, the Office 	of Contracting 
45 and Procurement, on 
behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another 
46 part 
of option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period January 	1, 2023 through 
47 February 28, 2023 in the additional not-to-exceed amount 
of $3,162,272.88. 
48 (f) By Modification No. 17, dated February 28, 2023, the Office 
of Contracting 
49 and Procurement, on 
behalf of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another 
50 part 
of option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period March 	1, 2023 through 
51 April 30, 2023 in the additional not-to-exceed amount 	of $3,162,272.88. 
52 (g) By Modification No. 
18, dated April 10, 2023, the Office 	of Contracting and 
53 Procurement, on behalf 
of the Metropolitan Police Department, exercised another part 	of 
54 option year 4 of Contract No. CW62890 for the period May 	1, 2023 through June 30, 
55 2023 in the additional not-to-exceed amount 	of $2,827,894.00 
2  56 (h) Modification No. 	19 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option 
57 year 4 for the period July 
1, 2023 through August 21, 2023 in the additional not-to-
58 exceed amount of $2,993,768.65, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for 
59 option year 4 to $18,880,560.20. 
60 (i) Modification No. 20 
is also now necessary to extend the term of the contract, 
61 on a sole source basis, for the period August 22, 2023 through August 21, 2024 in the 
62 not-to-exceed amount 
of $19,755,480.84. 
63 (j) Council approval is required by section 45l(b) of the District of Columbia 
64 Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official 
Code§ 1-
65 204.51(b)) since these modifications increase the contract to more than 	$1 million during 
66 a 12-month period during both the contract period beginning August 22, 2022 through 
67 August 21, 2023 and the contract period beginning August 22, 2023 through August 21, 
68 2024. 
69 (k) Approval 
is necessary to allow the continuation 	of these vital services. 
70 Without this approval, PFC Associates, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services 
71 provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period beginning August 22, 2022 
72 through August 21, 2023 or the contract period beginning August 22, 2023 through 
73 August 21, 2024. 
74 Sec. 
3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated 	in section 2 
75 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 	13, 
76 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20 to Contract No. CW62890 with PFC Associates, LLC 
77 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 
of 2023 be adopted after a single 
78 reading. 
3  79 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
4