District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0371 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/18/2023

                     	1 
 _____________________________ 1 
                       C ouncilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
 8 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 9 
_________________ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
_________________________ 13 
 14 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to provide  equitable 15 
real property tax relief to certain property owned by Grace Covenant Church 16 
located on Lot 0800, Square 4138.   17 
 18 
 19 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
resolution may be cited as the “	Grace Covenant Church Equitable Real Property Tax Relief 21 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 22 
Sec. 2. (a) Grace Covenant Church is a nondenominational church that was established in 23 
Ward 5 in the Brookland neighborhood in 1999 (“Church”)	. The congregation of the Church 24 
assembled and worshipped in rented properties until the Church purchased its current property 25 
on Lot 0800 in Square 4138 from Capital Temple Church of God in Christ in October 2019. The 26 
goal of this purchase was to have a permanent home and to renovate and expand the space to 27 
better accommodate the congregation, allow for community engagement, and create spaces for 28 
children.    29 
(b) The transfer of ownership terminated the real property tax exemption that had been 30 
granted to the previous owner. The Church mistakenly thought that the tax exemption had 31   	2 
transferred through the sale as similar operations were continuing as the property changed hands 1 
between the two churches. 2 
  (c) After receiving a tax bill, the Church filed an Application for Exemption from D.C. 3 
Real Property Tax form in December 2021. The application was approved by the Office of Tax 4 
and Revenue (“OTR”) and the exemption went into effect on January 1, 2022. Because the 5 
Church was not eligible for an exemption until the application was filed, OTR could not grant an 6 
exemption for prior periods. As a result, there currently remains an unpaid tax liability on the 7 
Church property from tax year 2020 through a portion of tax year 2022. 8 
   (d) On April 28, 2023, Councilmember McDuffie introduced a permanent version of this 9 
legislation and on June 28, 2023, the Committee on Business and Economic Development held a 10 
hearing on the permanent version (Bill 25	-281). The hearing included questioning by Chairman 11 
McDuffie to both the witness from the Church and a representative from the Office of the Chief 12 
Financial Officer. At this hearing the Office of the Chief Financial Officer supported the 13 
legislation. 14 
  (e) There is a need to pass this legislation via emergency because on October 1, 2023, the 15 
Church will accrue more interest and fines on the unpaid tax liability. T	o ensure that the amount 16 
budgeted by the District for this legislation is used in the current fiscal year, the legislation will 17 
need to be enacted before October 1.  18 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 19 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Grace Church Equitable Real Property 20 
Tax Relief Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 21 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 22