District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0390 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/18/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of 	Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), I am	pleased to nominate the following person:
Mr. Cliffton Tamorria 
Brandywine Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20016 
(Ward 3) 
for appointment as an elevator mechanic licensed in the District member of the Board of Industrial 
Trades, filling a vacant seat, for a term to end June 26, 2026. 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor 
September 18, 2023 1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
at the request of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
15 To confirm the appointment of Mr. Cliffton Tamorria as a member 	of the Board of 
16 Industrial Trades. 
17 
18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 resolution may be cited as the "Board of Industrial Trades Cliffton Tamorria Confirmation 
20 Resolution of 2023 ". 
21 
22 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 
23 	Mr. Cliffton Tamorria 
24 	Brandywine Street, NW 
25 	Washington, DC 20016 
26 	(Ward 3) 
27 
28 
as an elevator mechanic licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Industrial Trades, 
29 established by D.C. Official 	Code§ 47-2853.06(d), filling a vacant seat, for a term to end June 
30 26, 2026. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Cliffton Tamorria 
Condensed Resume  
DC Board Of Industrial Trades - Elevator Inspector  
Work History  
•June 2004: joined the International Union Of Elevator Constructors Local 10.
•2004-2006: Worked in the fields of construction and modernization with Quality and OTIS 
elevator.
•2006-2010: joined Schindler Elevator Corporation, working in the fields of service and 
maintenance of traction and hydraulic elevators, escalators and moving walks.
•January 2011-present: employee of the National Elevator Inspection Services, Bureau Veritas 
North America (NEIS/BVNA) as a QEI certified elevator inspector, working in all jurisdictions in 
the DMV area either directly as a contractor for the AHJ or as a contractor for private building 
owners, as applicable. Includes working directly with AHJs on streamlining inspection 
programs and solving complex problems related to IT and IS, among other practical issues 
related to the elevator inspection field in today’s ever changing technological world.  
Related Education  
•Completed the National Elevator Industry Education Program in September 2008.
•QEI Certified Elevator Inspector through NAESA International as of December 2010.
Personal Statement  
As a resident of the District of Columbia and a father of 2 children, I am proud to be given the 
opportunity to serve on the Board Of Industrial Trades, positively impacting where I live and 
work. If confirmed, I believe the knowledge I have gained over the last 17+ years working in the 
elevator trades could be a valuable asset to the Board and l look forward to assisting in 
whatever ways necessary. The most important thing that I have learned in my career is safety is 
paramount. Safety is part of our everyday lives and in everything we do. Speaking to an 
infrastructure environment- you can’t have safety without standards (e.g., standards in building 
code). Equally as important are the standards and qualifications of those who perform the work. 
Those who perform the work must be deemed competent, meeting the current qualifications 
necessary, as well as have access to training and educational resources to put into practice the 
unique requirements and standards mandated by the AHJ in today’s technology advancing 
world. Last but not least is accountability. Those who would try to subvert the rules and 
regulations for whatever reason must be held accountable, to a standard reasonable to the 
offense. Without accountability we cannot have safety, and without safety we all have nothing.    
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Cliffton Tamorria 
 
Cliffton “Cliff” Tamorria has been in the elevator industry since June 
2004, when he joined the International Union of Elevator 
Constructors’ (I.U.E.C) apprenticeship program. Mr. Tamorria 
worked in the fields of construction, modernization, service and 
maintenance with Quality, Otis, and Schindler elevator corporations. 
Being a part of several projects across the Washington Metro Region 
gave him a unique insight of how the building trades interact and 
function. In September 2008, 	Mr. Tamorria successfully completed 
the National Elevator Industry Education Program. In December 
2010 Mr. Tamorria was offered a position at National Elevator 
Inspection Services - Bureau Veritas North America and concurrently 
became a QEI Certified Elevator Inspector through the National 
Association of Elevator Safety Authorities (NAESA) International. During the last 13 years he 
has worked in all jurisdictions in the DMV as a 3rd party elevator inspector with NEIS Bureau 
Veritas where he remains employed at present.  
 
A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Tamorria is thrilled at the opportunity to be considered for the Board of 
Industrial Trades. 
 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 26, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Garth Grannum, Alex 	Lemu, 
Michael Johnson, Khidhar Abdulshakur, Gregory Kinyard, Jr., William H. Satterwhite III, and Cliffton Tamorria as members of the Board of Industrial Trades 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish