MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), I am pleased to nominate the following person: Mr. William H. Satterwhite III Burns Street, SE Washington, DC 20019 (Ward 7) for appointment as a plumber licensed in the District member of the Board of Industrial Trades, filling a vacant seat previously held by Terrence Hughes , for a term to end June 26, 2026. Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor September 18, 2023 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 Chairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 15 To confirm the appointment of Mr. William H. Satterwhite III as a member of the Board 16 of Industrial Trades. 17 18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 resolution may be cited as the "Board of Industrial Trades William H. Satterwhite III 20 Confirmation Resolution of 2023 ". 21 22 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 23 Mr. William H. Satterwhite III 24 Bums Street, SE 25 Washington, DC 20019 26 (Ward 7) 27 28 as a plumber licensed in the District member of the Board oflndustrial Trades, established by 29 D.C. Official Code§ 47-2853.06(d), filling a vacant seat previously held by Terrence Hughes, 30 for a term to end June 26, 2026. 31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 1 WILLIAM H. SATTERWHITE III I have considerable experience in residential and commercial designing/drawing, installing, and reviewing of domestic plumbing systems, sanitary, water and vent (potable and non-potable). I’m very knowledgeable of the National BOCO Plumbing Code. As a plumbing instructor I am responsible for providing instructional support to ensure students meet the established learning objectives and supporting the growth and development of the plumbing courses to comply with industry standards and the needs of the community. I’m also responsible for providing knowledge as a subject matter expert and one-on-one support to include responses to students’ academic inquiries using distance education technologies. PROFESSIONAL EXPERIENCE WHS PLUMBING & HEATING, Inc. [ Plumber Local Union #5] May 2002 to present. [Manager/Quality Control/Master Plumber]. Responsible for the daily operations of the business. L.E. Diggs, LLC. [Plumber Local Union #5] July 2015 to Present [Master Plumber]. Residential and commercial plumber for the daily operations of the business. Local Union #5 Plumbing School June 2022 to Present [Cross Connection, Backflow Instructor] Responsible for creating and following current lesson plans. Creating weekly test and daily lesson plans. Responsible for teaching hand procedures for testing and repairing all testable and non-testable backflow devices. Responsible for proctoring all Backflow exams, written and practical hands-on backflow testing procedure. CSOSA (Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency) July 2021 to Present [Plumbing Instructor] Responsible for creating the plumbing curriculum, all test, and all daily lesson plans. Denver-Elke. [Plumber Local Union #5] March 2020 to December 2020 [Master Plumber] To Perform all new plumbing work (groundwork wastepipe, domestic water pipe, gas pipe, pool water, vent pipe) during the rebuilding of the Flamingo Bird House at the National Zoo, Washington DC. J&J Worldwide Service. [Engineer Local Union #99] December 2017 to Sept. 2018 [Master Plumber]. Complete all open Plumbing and Preventive maintenance tickets at Walter Reed Medical Center. Shawn Willis Plumbing, LLC. July 2015 to December 2017 [Master Plumber/Manager/Quality Control]. Responsible for the daily operations of the business. City of Alexandria, VA February 2007 to August 2007 [Plumber/Mechanical Inspector]. Inspect new construction projects. (Plumbing and mechanical for residential and commercial projects) LOCAL UNION #5 January 1990 to December 2020 [Master Plumber]. Within the Union, worked for various companies. Positions consist of installing, maintaining, and repairing utility pipes. Also, reading as well as drawing building blueprint designs, installed and maintained, repaired and test plumbing in medium to large commercial buildings as well as residential plumbing. 2 WILLIAM H. SATTERWHITE III EDUCATION Montgomery Community College Sept 2021 to present. Major: Exercise Science National Personal Training Institute Jan 2015 to Jun 2015 Certified Personal Trainer Diploma - NPTI Washington, D.C., Joint Plumbing Apprentice Committee 1988 to 1996 Journeyman Diploma/License CERTIFICATIONS & LICENSES Master Plumber License: Wash, DC, WSSC, Virginia Master Gasfitter License: Wash, DC Journeyman Gasfitter License: Virginia & WSSC Cross Connection Certification: WSSC Welding Certifications: DC Boiler & AWS Security Clearance 2 PSI Certifications Safety Certification Med-gas Install/Braze Certified 1 st Aid Certification Computer Automated Drafting CPR/AED Certification Reference will be supplied upon request. Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 William H. Satterwhite III William Satterwhite is a manager, quality control expert, and master plumber with WHS Plumbing and Heating, Inc. He is also a master plumber with L.E. Diggs, LLC, a cross connection and backflow instructor with the Local Union #5 Plumbing School, and a plumbing instructor for the Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency. Mr. Satterwhite has over 30 years of experience in the plumbing industry. Mr. Satterwhite has extensive expertise in residential and commercial designing/drawing, installing, and reviewing of domestic plumbing systems. Throughout his career, Mr. Satterwhite has led daily plumbing business operations, performed residential and commercial plumbing services, proctored plumbing exams, and created plumbing curriculum for DC residents. A Ward 7 resident, Mr. Satterwhite is studying Exercise Science at Montgomery Community College. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724 -7681 To: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: June 26, 2023 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Garth Grannum, Alex Lemu, Michael Johnson, Khidhar Abdulshakur, Gregory Kinyard, Jr., William H. Satterwhite III, and Cliffton Tamorria as members of the Board of Industrial Trades This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above- referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-724-1303, or me at 202- 724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish