District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0437 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-271  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the District of Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation Act to repeal 
the direction to the Mayor that the functions enumerated in the act be delegated to the 
Director of the Department of Buildings. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Floodplain Review Authority Congressional Review Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Floodplain Review Authority 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-188; 70 DCR 10716) 
(“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on October 25, 2023.  
(b) The Floodplain Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on 
September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-355) (“temporary measure”), was approved by 
the Council on final reading at the September 19, 2023, legislative meeting. Because the 
temporary measure must undergo congressional review, it will not be in effect before the 
emergency measure expires. 
(c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 
the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the temporary measure. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Floodplain Review Authority 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.