District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0439 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/28/2023

                     	1 
_____________________________  _____________________________ 1 
Chairman Phil Mendelson  Councilmember Christina Henderson  2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 
 8 
 9 
_________ 10 
 11 
 12 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 
 14 
__________________ 15 
 16 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 17 
to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to remove the requirement 18 
that eligible students in the District of Columbia receive a vaccination against COVID-19 
19; and to repeal the Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Temporary 20 
Amendment Act of 2022. 21 
 22 
RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 
resolution may be cited as the “School Student Vaccination Emergency Congressional Review 24 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 25 
Sec. 2. (a)  On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the “School Student Vaccination 26 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. The Act became law on July 31, 2023, and is set to expire 27 
on October 29, 2023.  28 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “School Student Vaccination 29 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. The temporary measure is currently under Mayoral 30 
review and then it must pass Congressional review.  31 
(c) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  33   	2 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 34 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the School 35 
Student Vaccination Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 36 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37