District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0452 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-268  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Amendment Act of 2022 to 
clarify when law enforcement officers have authority to engage in a vehicular pursuit of a 
suspect motor vehicle. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit Clarification Congressional 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. (a) On July 20, 2023, the Council passed the Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit 
Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 20, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-174; 70 
DCR 10356) (“emergency act”), which expires on October 18, 2023. 
 (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit 
Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 25, 2023 
(Enrolled version of Bill 25-388) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law 
date. 
 (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Law Enforcement Vehicular Pursuit 
Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 
single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.