ENROLLED ORIGINAL A RESOLUTION 25-265 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA October 3, 2023 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to amend the Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of 2004 to require the Office of Unified Communications to collect and post publicly on the Office’s website the number of calls eligible to be diverted to alternative responses, the number of those calls diverted, and data on daily call-taking and dispatching operations; and to amend section 16-1053 of the District of Columbia Official Code to add a representative of the Office of Unified Communications as a member of the Domestic Violence Fatality Review Board. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-198; 70 DCR 10746) (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-375) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law date. (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. Sec. 3 The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.