District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0454 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                      ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-266  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend Chapter 3 of Title 13 of the District of Columbia Official Code, to include 
appointments of a vulnerable youth guardian under legal actions that may have published 
notice in substitution of personal service of process, and to amend Chapter 23 of Title 16 
of the District of Columbia Official Code to authorize the Family Division of the 
Superior Court to appoint, modify, and terminate a new class of legal guardianship for 
vulnerable youth.   
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-203; 70 DCR 10758) 
(“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Temporary 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 
25-386) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law date. 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 
Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single 
reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.