District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0456 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-276  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, amend the 
Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to allow the 
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board (“ABC Board”) to issue temporary non-resident 
registration identification cards that are valid for periods between 3 days and no longer 
than one year in length, allow licensed testing laboratories to receive and test samples of 
medical cannabis products from qualifying patients, allow licensed testing laboratories to 
conduct quality assurance or research and development testing for cultivation centers and 
manufacturers, amend the definition of a social equity applicant to include arrests and 
convictions of qualifying family members for a cannabis or drug offense, expand the list 
of eligible family members under the social equity applicant definition to include siblings 
and grandparents, clarify that existing licensed cultivation centers and retailers and 
applicants that scored 150 points or more during the open application period that 
occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, that are authorized by statute 
to receive a cultivation center, manufacturer, or retailer license apart from a designated 
open application period are not counted in calculating the 50% set aside requirement, 
clarify that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more 
during the same open application period shall automatically receive a manufacturer 
license provided that they pay the annual fee and register with the ABC Board, allow the 
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration to issue conditional licenses to testing 
laboratory applicants, and to waive the application fee for testing laboratory licenses.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification and Non-Resident Patient Access 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
   
   Sec. 2(a) There existed a need to expand non-resident patient access at licensed retailer 
by making temporary non-resident patient registrations valid for periods other than 30 days, to 
expand the definition of a social equity applicant to include arrests and convictions of qualifying 
family members for a cannabis or drug-related offense and add siblings and grandparents to the 
list of eligible family members, and to clarify that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
that scored 150 points or more during the ABC Board open application period that occurred 
between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, are automatically eligible to receive a 
manufacturer license provided they pay the annual fee and register with the ABC Board.  
 (b) In July 2023, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Clarification and Non-
Resident Patient Access Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 
25-194; 70 DCR 10733), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical Cannabis Clarification and 
Non-Resident Patient Access Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd on reading on 
September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version Bill 25-368), (“temporary legislation”) to address the 
above-referenced needs.  
 (c) The emergency legislation expires on October 29, 2023.  The temporary legislation 
must still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of the District of 
Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-
206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency legislation has expired. 
 (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in effect, 
without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Clarification and Non-
Resident Patient Access Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted 
after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.