District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0459 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/02/2023

                     
1 
 
            _____________________________ 1 
                        Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
      3 
 4 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 
 6 
______ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
 10 
__________ 11 
 12 
 
 13 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to 14 
amend the Freedom of Information Act of 1976 to exempt from disclosure critical 15 
infrastructure information or plans that contain critical infrastructure information for the 16 
critical infrastructures of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority.  17 
   18 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 
resolution may be cited as the “DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information 20 
Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 21 
 Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure 22 
Freedom of Information Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 26, 2023 23 
(D.C. Act 25-201; 70 DCR 10754) (“emergency act”), which will expire on October 24, 2023.  24 
 (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure 25 
Freedom of Information Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, approved on 2nd 26 
reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-380) (“temporary act”), which was 27 
transmitted to the Mayor on July 26, 2023, with a response from the Mayor due on October 11, 28 
2023. 29   
2 
 
 (c) The temporary act cannot complete 30 days of congressional review before October 24, 30 
2023, when the emergency act will expire. 31 
 (d) This congressional emergency is now necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  33 
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 34 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom 35 
of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 36 
adopted after a single reading. 37 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 38