District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0476 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/12/2023

                     
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
 
October 12, 2023 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson, Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-	523.01), and pursuant to 	D.C. Official Code § 47-825.01a, I am 
pleased to nominate the following individual:  
 
Mr. Olufemi Abayomi -Paul 
Massachusetts Avenue, 	NW  
Washington, DC 20005 
(Ward 2) 
 
for reappointment to the Real Property Tax Appeals Commission as a 	full-time Commissioner, 
for a term to end April 30 , 2027.  
 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing Mr. Abayomi-Paul’s experience, along 
with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation.  
Please do not hesitate to contact me or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s 	Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information. 
 
 
Sincerely, 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor
  1 
2 	hairman Phil Mendelson 
3 
at the request of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Olufemi Abayomi-Paul to the Real Property Tax Appeals 
15 Commission. 
16 
17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Real Property Tax Appeals Commission Olufemi Abayomi-Paul 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2023". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
21 	Mr. Olufemi Abayomi-Paul 
22 	Massachusetts A venue, NW 
23 	Washington, DC 20005 
24 	(Ward 2) 
25 
26 as a full-time Commissioner of the Real Property Tax Appeals Commission, established by D.C. 
27 Official Code § 47-825.0la, for a term to end April 30, 2027. 
28 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
29 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
30 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Olufemi Abayomi-Paul 
1312 Massachusetts Ave Apt 405 
Washington, D.C. 
301-641-8672 
Femi45th@gmail.com
 
 
• Dynamic, goal-oriented leader with experience in real estate appraisal/valuation analyses for 
tax assessment purposes.  
• Possesses in-depth knowledge of time management principles to include planning, project 
management, communication, and resource management.  
• Excellent customer service and problem	-solving skills.  
• Knowledge and experience in computer application, installation, and maintenance. 
 
Work Experience 8/11- Present: Senior Commercial Real Property Appraiser/Assessor- 
District of Columbia Major Property, Office of Tax and Revenue, Real 
Property Tax Administration, Assessment Division 
• Prepare, present, and defend estimated commercial real property 	values for tax assessment purposes at three levels of appeal in the 	District of Columbia. Responsible for assessing 264 accounts of 	commercial property annually with a value totaling 
$4,975,731,174. Apply standard appraisal procedures and 	analyses of market data. Perform site inspections and record 	technical details, including income producing potential and 
development potential, of commercial and industrial land and/or 	buildings.  Analyze hotel properties and possessory leasehold 
interests to determine estimated market values for tax assessment 	purposes. Review financial reports, income and expense 	statements, tax returns, and other data.  Perform sales 
comparison, income, and cost valuation analyses as appropriate 	to arrive at estimated market values. Utilize CAMA (Computer 	Aided Mass Appraisal), ITS (Integrated Tax System), Marshall & 	Swift, and other valuation systems to support value estimates and 	analyses. Explain valuation analyses and rationale, both verbally 	and in writing. Communicate, coordinate, and negotiate, as 
necessary, with real property owners and their representation at 
all levels of the appeal process. 
  	10/07 - 7/11: Commercial Assessor - Commercial & Industrial 
Department, Maryland State Department of Assessments and Taxation 
• Determined commercial and industrial real property values for 	tax assessment purposes and defended value estimates at all 
levels of the appeal process in the State of Maryland.  Applied 	standard appraisal methods and procedures, including sales 	comparison, cost, and income approaches to value.  Utilized 	CAMA (Computer Aided Mass Appraisal) and other valuation   
systems to support value estimates. Explained valuation analyses 	and rationale to all parties involved.    
      
 
Olufemi Abayomi-	Paul 
Page 2 
 
 
10/04- 10/07: Residential Assessor - Residential Real Property 
Department, Maryland State Department of Assessments and Taxation  
• Determined residential real property values for tax assessment 
purposes and defended value estimates at all levels of the 
appeal process in the State of Maryland. Primarily utilized the 
sales comparison approach but applied other standard appraisal 
methods as necessary. Explained analyses and rationale to 
homeowners and other parties involved. 
   
Education               	University of Maryland , College Park  
Bachelor of Arts, Government & Politics, December 2003 
 
Continuing Education  Income Approach to Valuation 
  	Income Approach to Valuation II 
Fundamentals of Mass Appraisal  
Fundamentals of Real Property Appraisal 
Commercial/Industrial Modeling Concepts 
Assessment Administration 
The National Uniform Standards of Professional Appraisal 
Practice 
Appraisal of Land 
Mass Appraisal Practices and Procedures 
Tax Policy 
Basic Appraisal Principles 
Basic Apprai sal Procedures 
 
 
 
   
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
          
Olufemi Abayomi-Paul
 
  
Mr. Olufemi Abayomi-Paul is a commissioner on the Real Property 
Tax Appeals Commission.  
 
 
Mr. Abayomi-Paul possesses over 16 years of experience in real 
property assessments.  Mr. Abayomi-Paul began his career as a 
residential assessor in Charles County, Maryland. His duties 
included inspecting and valuing residential property as well as 
defending those values during all levels of the appeals process. He 
transitioned into a role as commercial assessor for Charles County 
focusing on valuing all types of commercial property. During his time with the State of 
Maryland, he was promoted to a supervisory role where he managed seven employees 
and reviewed and approved employees’ assessments of newly constructed residential 
properties.  
 
  
In 2011, Mr. Abayomi-Paul became a Senior Appraiser with the District of Columbia Office of 
Tax and Revenue, where 	he assesses large commercial office buildings for ad valorem taxation 
purposes, conducts market and sales research, reviews income and expense statements, inspects 
properties, and determines estimated market value of properties based on income analysis. Mr. 
Abayomi-Paul has experience presenting analyses and rationale to property owners and their 
legal representation at three levels of the appeal process and negotiates value reductions based on 
market data and the evidence provided by property owners.  
 
   
A Ward 2 resident, Mr. Abayomi-Paul received his Bachelor of Arts in Government and Politics 
from the University of Maryland at College Park.  
 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 8, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Olufemi Abayomi-Paul as a 
full-time Commissioner of the Real Property Tax Appeals Commission 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolution and 
found it to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish