District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0508 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/01/2023

                     
 	1 
               ______________________________                                                                                1 
             Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
  9 
______ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 17 
the need to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a 18 
statement with their credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by 19 
the COVID-19 pandemic. 20 
 21 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 
this resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional 23 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the “Public Health Emergency 25 
Credit Alert Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. The Act became law on July 31, 2023 26 
and expires on October 29, 2023. 27 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “Public Health Emergency 28 
Credit Alert Temporary Amendment Act of 2023.” The temporary measure was signed 29 
by the Mayor on October 11, 2023.   30 
(c) The measure has not completed its 30-day Congressional review period. 31 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law 32 
between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  33 
 34   
 	2 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the 35 
circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 36 
necessary that the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review 37 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 38 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39