District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0516 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-336  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
November 7, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification 1 to 
Contract No. NFPHC-HL-23-C between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation, 
commonly known as United Medical Center, and George Washington University Medical 
Faculty Associates, Inc. to provide inpatient hospitalists services, and to authorize 
payment for the services received and to be received under the contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification 1 to Contract No. NFPHC-HL-23-C between the 
Not-for Profit Hospital Corporation and George Washington University Medical Faculty 
Associates, Inc., (“GW MFA”) Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration 
Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification 1 to Contract No. 
NFPHC-HL-23-C (“Contract”) between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation (“Hospital”) and 
George Washington University Medical Faculty Associates, Inc. (“GW MFA”) to provide 
inpatient hospitalists services to the Hospital, and to authorize payment for the services received 
and to be received under the Contract. 
(b) The Council approved the base year on December 6, 2022.   
(c) Despite a timely start to negotiations, reaching mutual agreement took longer than 
expected – a frequent experience for the Hospital as the closure nears. To avoid a disruption in 
the provision of these services, proposed Modification 1 is being submitted retroactively.  
(d) Council approval is necessary because Modification 1, which exercises option year 
one for the period October 1, 2023, to September 30, 2024, is in the amount of $5,978,204.84, 
which exceeds $1 million in a 12-month period. 
(e) Without this approval, GW MFA cannot be paid for these critical services provided 
and to be provided in excess of $1 million. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification 1 to Contract No. NFPHC-
HL-23-C between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and George Washington University   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Medical Faculty Associates, Inc., (“GW MFA”) Approval and Payment Authorization 
Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.