District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0525 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/02/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
November 2, 2023
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of 
the District of Co lumbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mende lson: 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), I am 
pleased to nominate the following person:
Mr. Khidhar Abdulshakur 
Mississippi A venue, SE 
Washington, DC 20032 
(Ward 8) 
for appointment as an asbestos worker member of the 
Board of Industrial Trades, filling 	a vacant 
seat, for a term to 
end June 26, 2026. 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-	mentioned 
nominee, 
together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I 
would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
~ 
at the request of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
15 To confirm the appointment of Mr. Khidhar Abdulshakur as a member of the Board of 
16 Industrial Trades. 
17 
18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 resolution may be cited as the "Board 	of Industrial Trades Khidhar Abdulshakur Confirmation 
20 Resolution of 2023". 
21 
22 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 
23 	Mr. Khidhar Abdulshakur 
24 	Mississippi A venue, SE 
25 	Washington, DC 20032 
26 	(Ward 8) 
27 
28 as an asbestos worker member 	of the Board oflndustrial Trades, established by D.C. Official 
29 Code§ 47-2853.06(d), for a term to end June 26, 2026. 
30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Khidhar Abdulshakur 
 
 
Pursuing opportunities for different customer service career fields where experience, accomplishments and 
proficiency can be transl ated into improved growth and success. 
 
WORK EXPERIENCE: 
 
  
 
Goel Services -- 9/2014 – current 
• Perform tasks involving physical labor at construction sites.  
• May operate hand and power tools of all types: air hammers, earth tampers, 
cement mixers, small mechanical hoists, surveying and measuring equipment	, and a 
variety of other equipment and instruments.  
• May clean and prepare sites, dig trenches, set braces to support the sides of excavations, 
erect scaffolding, and clean up rubble, debris and other waste materials. May assist other 
craft workers. 
• Conducts step- by-step Asbestos abatement  
• Performs work safely in accordance with departmental safety procedures and operates 
equipment safely 
• Reports any unsafe work condition or practice to supervisor 
 
Rath Enterprises 7/2016 – 04/2023 
 
• 
Perform tasks involving phys ical labor at construction s ites.  
• 
May operate hand and power tools of all types: air hammers, earth tampers, cement 
mixers, small mechanical hoists, surveying and mea suring equipment, and a variety 
of other equipment and ins	truments. 
 
• 
May clean and prepare s	ites, dig trenches, s et braces to s upport the s ides of 
excavations, erect s caffolding, and clean up rubble, debris and other waste materials .
 
• 
Conducts step-by-step asbestos abatement   
• 
Performs work s afely in accordance with departmental s	afety procedures and 
operates equipment s afely. 
 
• 
Reports any unsafe work condition or practice to s	upervisor 
 
  
 Two Men & A Truck ( Driver/Mover) 8/2012 – 8/2014 
• Driving 20’ trucks 
• Transporting goods and materials over land to and from several destinations or retail 
and distribution centers 
• Inspecting vehicles for mechanical items and safety issues and perform preventative 
maintenance 
• Planning routes and meeting delivery schedules 
• Moving furniture, loading and unloading trucks of furniture on and off trucks 
 
Department of Parks & Recreation  – Washington, DC - 2/2006 - 7/2012  Recreation Coordinator  
• Ensure recreation facilities are maintained in order to ensure a safe, clean and appropriate 
environment for recreation activities  
• Prepare facility schedules  
• Develop preventative maintenance programs  
• Supervise janitorial services  
• Ensure facility policy and regulations are adhered to  
• Supervise the Recreation Facility Maintainer  
• Book all sport rental and community events  
• Manage contracts associated with the recreation program  
• Assist with planning and developing sport and recreation programs in order to ensure that 
activities and events are made available for all community members  
• Administer recreation programs to ensure that programs are delivered within guidelines 
and budgets  
• Implement recreation programs to ensure that residents have access to sport, recreation 
and leisure activities  
  
Department of Human Services – Washington, DC - 3/2005-9/2005  
• Outreach Specialist- Way to Work Worker 
• Provide assistance 	with calls to various social service agencies as 	appropriate Provide assistance 
in obtaining access to care and services and making appointments 
 
• 
Provide general and case aide support for case load carrying staff including maintaining case 
files, general filing, and making phone calls 
 
• 
Assist with tracking and maintain adequate supplies and forms  
• 
Receive various forms/papers brought in by clients checking for completeness. Date 
stamp documents and distribute appropriately 
 
  
EDUCATION:  
  
University of the District of Columbia  
 2 years attended; 25 credit hours  
  
  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
References provided upon request 
   
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Khidhar Abdulshakur 
 
Khidhar Abdulshakur is a licensed asbestos worker in the District of 
Columbia. He currently works with Goel Services asbestos abatement 
and many other construction-	related duties.  
  
Mr. Abdulshakur has been practicing asbestos abatement for nearly a 
decade. In his previous role with Rath Enterprises, he managed a twenty -
person crew, providing daily oversight and training. Mr. Abdulshakur 
works closely with the Liuna Local 11 Union to receive training and 
networking resources, as well as job leads.  
 
A Ward 8 resident, Mr. Abdulshakur studied at the University of the District of Columbia. 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 26, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Garth Grannum, Alex 	Lemu, 
Michael Johnson, Khidhar Abdulshakur, Gregory Kinyard, Jr., William H. Satterwhite III, and Cliffton Tamorria as members of the Board of Industrial Trades 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish