District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0527 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/02/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
November 2, 2023
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of 
the District of Co lumbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mende lson: 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 47-2853.06(d), I am 
pleased to nominate the following person:
Mr. William H. 
Satterwhite III 
Burns Str
eet, SE 
Washington, DC 20019 
(Ward 7) 
for appointment as a plumber licensed in the District member of the B	oard of I
ndustrial Trades, 
filling a vacant seat previously held 
by Terrence Hughes, for 	a term to end June 26, 2026. 
Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, 
together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I 
would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
?JP;?;Y~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
15 To confirm the appointment of Mr. William H. Satterwhite III 	as a member of the Board 
16 of Industrial Trades. 
17 
18 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 resolution may be cited as the "Board 	of Industrial Trades William H. Satterwhite III 
20 Confirmation Resolution of 2023". 
21 
22 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment 	of: 
23 	Mr. William H. Satterwhite III 
24 	Bums Street, SE 
25 	Washington, DC 20019 
26 	(Ward 7) 
27 
28 as a plumber licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Industrial Trades, established by 
29 D.C. Official Code§ 47-2853.06(d), filling a vacant seat previously held by Terrence Hughes, 
30 for a term to end June 26, 2026. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  1 
WILLIAM H. SATTERWHITE III    
 
 
 
I have considerable experience in residential and commercial designing/drawing, installing, and reviewing 
of domestic plumbing systems, sanitary, water and vent (potable and non-potable). I’m very knowledgeable 
of the National BOCO Plumbing Code. As a plumbing instructor I am responsible for providing 
instructional support to ensure students meet the established learning objectives and supporting the growth 
and development of the plumbing courses to comply with industry standards and the needs of the 
community. I’m also responsible for providing knowledge as a subject matter expert and one-on-one 
support to include responses to students’ academic inquiries using distance education technologies.  
 
PROFESSIONAL EXPERIENCE 
 
WHS PLUMBING & HEATING, Inc. [ Plumber Local Union #5] May 2002 to present. 
 [Manager/Quality Control/Master Plumber].  Responsible for the daily operations of  
the business. 
 
 L.E. Diggs, LLC. [Plumber Local Union #5] July 2015 to Present 
 [Master Plumber].  Residential and commercial plumber for the daily operations of the business. 
 
Local Union #5 Plumbing School June 2022 to Present  
              [Cross Connection, Backflow Instructor] Responsible for creating and following current lesson 
plans. Creating weekly test and daily lesson plans. Responsible for teaching hand procedures for testing and 
repairing all testable and non-testable backflow devices. Responsible for proctoring all Backflow exams, 
written and practical hands-on backflow testing procedure. 
   
CSOSA (Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency) July 2021 to Present 
           [Plumbing Instructor] Responsible for creating the plumbing curriculum, all test, and all daily lesson 
plans. 
 
Denver-Elke. [Plumber Local Union #5] March 2020 to December 2020 
        [Master Plumber] To Perform all new plumbing work (groundwork wastepipe, domestic water pipe, 
gas pipe, pool water, vent pipe) during the rebuilding of the Flamingo Bird House at the National Zoo, 
Washington DC.  
 
  J&J Worldwide Service. [Engineer Local Union #99] December 2017 to Sept. 2018 
 [Master Plumber].  Complete all open Plumbing and Preventive maintenance tickets at Walter 
Reed Medical Center. 
 
Shawn Willis Plumbing, LLC. July 2015 to December 2017  
 [Master Plumber/Manager/Quality Control].  Responsible for the daily operations of the business. 
 
City of Alexandria, VA   February 2007 to August 2007 
[Plumber/Mechanical Inspector].  Inspect new construction projects.  
(Plumbing and mechanical for residential and commercial projects) 
 
LOCAL UNION #5 January 1990 to December 2020 
[Master Plumber].  Within the Union, worked for various companies.  Positions consist of 
installing, maintaining, and repairing utility pipes.  Also, reading as well as drawing building blueprint 
designs, installed and maintained, repaired and test plumbing in medium to large commercial buildings as 
well as residential plumbing. 
 
 
 
   2 
WILLIAM H. SATTERWHITE III 
  
 
 
 
EDUCATION 
 
 
Montgomery Community College Sept 2021 to present. 
 Major: Exercise Science   
 
National Personal Training Institute   Jan 2015 to Jun 2015 
  Certified Personal Trainer Diploma - NPTI 
 
Washington, D.C., Joint Plumbing Apprentice Committee  
 1988 to 1996   Journeyman Diploma/License 
 
 
CERTIFICATIONS & LICENSES 
 
Master Plumber License:   Wash, DC, WSSC, Virginia  
Master Gasfitter License:    Wash, DC 
Journeyman Gasfitter License:  Virginia & WSSC 
Cross Connection Certification:  WSSC 
Welding Certifications:  DC Boiler & AWS 
Security Clearance 
2 PSI Certifications 
Safety Certification 
Med-gas Install/Braze Certified 
1
st
 Aid Certification 
Computer Automated Drafting 
CPR/AED Certification 
 
 
 
 
Reference will be supplied upon request. 
 
 
    
Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, 	Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
William H. Satterwhite III 
William Satterwhite is a manager, quality control expert, and master 
plumber with WHS Plumbing and Heating, Inc. 	He is also a master 
plumber with L.E. Diggs, LLC, a cross connection and backflow 
instructor with the Local Union #5 Plumbing School, and a plumbing 
instructor for the Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency.  
Mr. Satterwhite has over 30 years of experience in the plumbing 
industry. Mr. Satterwhite has extensive expertise in residential and 
commercial designing/drawing, installing, and reviewing of domestic 
plumbing systems. Throughout his career, Mr. Satterwhite has led daily 
plumbing business operations, performed residential and commercial plumbing services, proctored 
plumbing exams, and created plumbing curriculum for DC residents. 
 
A Ward 7 resident, Mr. Satterwhite is studying Exercise Science at Montgomery Community 
College. 
 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724 -7681 
 
To:   Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   June 26, 2023 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Garth Grannum, Alex 	Lemu, 
Michael Johnson, Khidhar Abdulshakur, Gregory Kinyard, Jr., William H. Satterwhite III, and Cliffton Tamorria as members of the Board of Industrial Trades 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-	referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  	If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 	202-724-1303, or me at 202-	724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 	Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish