District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0545 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/05/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
 
25-374 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 5, 2023 
 
 
To declare an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Green Buildings Act of 2006 to 
temporarily postpone the applicability of net zero energy requirements to District-
financed housing. 
 
RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Green Housing Transition Extension Emergency Declaration 	Resolution of 2023”. 
 	Sec. 2. (a) Net zero energy building standard	s require that a building’s energy 
consumption not exceed the building’s onsite or dedicated offsite renewable energy generation 	and that no fossil fuel combustion takes place at the building.  
(b) Under current law	, the Mayor is required to promulgate rules by the end of calendar 
year 2026 that will impose a version of the net zero energy building standard on most new and 
substantially improved buildings.  
(c) On January 12, 2023, 	Mayor Bowser signed into law the Greener Government 
Buildings Act of 2022, which among other things compels District government agencies to 	achieve net zero energy compliance in most new or substantially improved government and 
government-funded buildings. The effect of the net zero energy compliance provisions of the 
Greener Government Buildings Amendment Act of 2022 would be to accelerate existing net zero 	mandates specifically for government and government-funded buildings.  
(d) As part of the Fiscal Year 2024 budget process, the Council funded the Greener 
Government Buildings Amendment Act of 2022 and repealed its subject-to-appropriations 
provision, allowing it to become applicable. 
(e) Following the conclusion of the budget process, the Department of Housing and 
Community Development (“DHCD” ) raised concerns that the applicability of the newly 
accelerated net zero energy mandate wou ld render infeasible a number of ongoing housing 
development projects, because DHCD and its housing finance partner agencies had already 
approved detailed applications for District government financing that were developed at a time 	when net zero energy design requirements were not in effect and therefore did not take net zero 
energy design requirements into account.     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
(f) In the Green Housing Transition Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023, the 
Council noted that abruptly abandoning existing housing development finance plans would mean 
missing out on important opportunities to increase affordable housing and retain lower-income 
households in the District. Therefore, on June 20, 2023, the Council passed the Green Housing 
Transition Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, which exempted from the net zero energy 
mandate all District-	financed affordable housing projects for which funding was committed prior 
to December 31, 2023.  
(g) Despite this grace period, DHCD has raised concern 	that some projects that were 
already far along the development pipeline, and for which the District government has already 
indicated support, still have not received all necessary funding commitments . Most notably, they 
are concerned that the existing emergency would not allow the DC Housing Finance Agency 
(“DCHFA” ) to award funds to several such projects as part of the upcoming January 2024 round 
of financing awards.  
(h) As a result of ongoing negotiations, f	urther legislation from the Mayor is anticipated. 
In the meantime, additional emergency legislation is needed to, at minimum, protect the projects 
currently under contemplation for the January 2024 round of DCHFA funding.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
an emergency making it necessary that the Green Housing Transition Extension Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023 	be adopted after a single reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.