District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0547 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/04/2023

                     
1 
 
  _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 
__________ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
____________________ 10 
 11 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 12 
to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 13 
property to abide by agreed upon 	rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 14 
 15 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 16 
may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 17 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 18 
Sec. 2. (a) During the COVID-19 pandemic, the Council created protections and 19 
procedural changes to address the widespread ramifications of the public health emergency and 20 
its aftermath. The District removed the initial COVID-19 public health emergency in July 21 
2021. The Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2021, effective June 24, 2021 22 
(D.C. Law 24- 9; 68 DCR 4824) (“Temporary Act”), which contained many of the longer-term 23 
protective measures, expired on February 4, 2022. 24 
(b) For commercial and residential tenants, provisions in the Temporary Act provided 25 
that their rental provider were required to offer a rent payment plan for eligible tenants 26 
between March 11, 2020, and July 25, 2022. The payment plans had to have a minimum term 27 
length of one year, unless otherwise agreed upon by the tenant and provider, during which time 28 
providers could not report to credit reporting agencies as delinquent any payments made under 29   
2 
 
an agreed upon plan. The Temporary Act also required providers to retain tenant payment plan 30 
applications for at least 3 years. 31 
(c) The Council passed two rounds of emergency and temporary legislation to ensure 32 
continuity in the law for tenants whose payment plans are not yet complete and to uphold the 33 
requirement that providers retain payment plan application records for at least 3 years.  34 
(d) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted a third round of emergency legislation 35 
called the “ Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023”	. The Act 36 
became law on October 11, 2023 and expires on January 9, 2024. 37 
(e) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted a corresponding third round of temporary 38 
legislation called the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Emergency Act of 2023”. The 39 
temporary measure was enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023 and was 40 
transmitted to Congress on November 6, 2023. 41 
(f) This measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This identical 42 
emergency legislation is therefore necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration 43 
of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  44 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 45 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant 46 
Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 must be 47 
adopted after a single reading. 48 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 49