District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0548 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/05/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-366  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 5, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the 
need to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary 
agreements.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 
1985 (D.C. Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.21), allows housing providers to enter into 
an agreement with 70% or more of the tenants in a housing accommodation to establish 
the rent charged, to make changes to services and facilities, and provide for capital 
improvements. These agreements are called voluntary agreements and must be filed 
with the Rent Administrator. 
(b) In September 2020, the former Committee on Housing and Neighborhood 
Revitalization held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23-878, the Voluntary Agreement 
Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, which would impose a 2-year moratorium on 
voluntary agreements. According to the Committee Report, a majority of public 
witnesses, the then-Director of the Department of Housing and Community 
Development Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve testified in 
support of the moratorium; many expressed that the legislation should go further and 
eliminate voluntary agreements altogether. A few testimonies stated the importance of 
voluntary agreements to small landlords, though most focused on the negative impact 
voluntary agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the affordable housing stock. 
(c) In December 2020, the Council unanimously passed the 2-year moratorium. 
Because the measure was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took 
effect at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022 on October 1, 2021. 
(d)  In July 2023, Councilmember Bonds introduced legislation that would 
eliminate voluntary agreements on a permanent basis. The Council has not yet held a 
hearing on this introduced legislation. 
(e) The existing 2-year moratorium expired on October 1, 2023.  
(f) On September 19, 2023, the Council enacted the Voluntary Agreement    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 (“emergency act”) to extend the 
moratorium for one year, which will give the Council time to deliberate a permanent 
legislative solution. The emergency act became law on October 11, 2023, and expires 
on January 9, 2024. 
(g) On October 3, 2023, the Council adopted the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023 (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure was 
enacted without the Mayor’s signature on October 26, 2023, and was transmitted to Congress on 
November 6, 2023.  
(h) The temporary measure is not projected to become law until January 17, 2024. This 
identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of 
the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary measure.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement 
Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 
single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.