District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0549 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/04/2023

                    1 
 
 1 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Charles Allen 	Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
_________________ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
_________________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend section 25-113 of 15 
the District of Columbia Official Code to extend the expiration date of the Streatery 16 
Program. 17 
 18 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 
resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution 20 
of 2023”. 21 
 22 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 30, 2022, the Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation 23 
Amendment Act of 2022 took effect (D.C. Law 24-127), which allows Alcoholic Beverage 24 
Control Board (“Board”) licensed establishments that register with the Board to offer beer, wine, 25 
or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space until December 31, 2023 (“Streatery Program”).  26 
(b) As of October 17, 2023, there are currently 178 licensed establishments that have 27 
registered and possess temporary Streatery Program endorsements from the Board that will 28 
expire on December 31, 2023. 29 
(c) On October 11, 2023, the District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) 30 
announced the extension of temporary Streatery Program permits through December 31, 2024, to 31 
allow DDOT more time to develop regulations and guidelines needed to facilitate a permanent 32 
Streatery Program. 33  2 
 
(d) The Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration (“ABCA”) is currently 34 
working on legislation that would amend Title 25 of the District of Columbia Official Code to 35 
create a permanent Streatery Program endorsement.  ABCA is also working collaboratively with 36 
DDOT on a permanent Streatery Program.  In the interim, emergency legislation is necessary to 37 
extend the Streatery Program for an additional year while permanent legislation is considered by 38 
the Council. 39 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 40 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program Extension Emergency 41 
Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 42 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43