District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0563 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/19/2023

                    1 
  	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-393 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 19, 2023 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental 
Housing Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s 
issuance  of, certificates of assurance associated with District rent stabilization laws. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) Section 221 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. 
Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.21), allows owners of housing accommodations to apply for 
certificates of assurance from the Mayor, which would provide that in the event their properties 
become subject to any rent stabilization, the owners would recover in the form of a District real 
estate tax credit the difference between the annual fair market rents and the annual amount of 
stabilized rents the owners receive from the tenants in the housing accommodations.  
(b) Because the certificate of assurance entitlement lasts for as long as the properties 
remain housing accommodations, the entitlement may create a potentially prohibitive fiscal 
impact on future reform legislation.  
(c) Implementation barriers and concerns kept the program from ever being fully 
operational.  
(d) On September 22, 2020, the Council passed the Certificate of Assurance Moratorium 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2020, effective November 2, 2020 (D.C. Act 23-454; 67 DCR 
13216), which placed an emergency moratorium on applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance 
of, certificates of assurance to owners of housing accommodations.  
(e) Most recently, this moratorium was extended by the Certificate of Assurance 
Moratorium Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective June 14, 2023 (D.C. Law 
25-18; 70 DCR 6337), which will expire on January 25, 2024.   
(f) Emergency legislation is necessary to maintain the status quo while permanent 
legislation is introduced and considered. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 
Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Second Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be  2 
  	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
adopted  after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.