MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR December 13, 2023 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 205 of the Washington Convention Center Authority Act of 1994, effective September 28, 1994 (D.C. Law 10-188; D.C. Official Code § 10-1202.05), I am pleased to nominate: Mr. Alan Bubes 31st Street, NW Washington, DC 20007 (Ward 3) for reappointment as a public member of the Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors, for a term to end May 16, 2027. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above nominee, together with proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION Chairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Alan Bubes as a member of the Washington Convention 14 and Sports Authority Board of Directors. 15 16 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 resolution may be cited as the "Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors 18 Alan Bubes Confim1ation Resolution of 2023". 19 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 20 Mr. Alan Bubes 21 31st Street, NW 22 Washington, DC 20007 23 (Ward 3) 24 as a public member of the Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors, 25 established by section 205 of the Washington Convention Center Authority Act of 1994, 26 effective September 28, 1994 (D.C. Law 10-188; D. C. Official Code§ 10-1202.05), for a term to 27 end May 16, 2027. 28 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 29 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 30 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. Alan Bubes Education Sidwell Friends High School, Washington, DC Graduate 1970 Georgia Institute of Technology, Atlanta GA B.S. Industrial Management 1974 Numerous Management Classes & Seminars 1974 - Present Professional Experience 1986-2012 Linens of the Week Washington, DC • Sold Linens of the Week a Regional Textile Supply & Rental Company in 2012 • Held Position of President 1986-2000 • 2000-2012 CEO • Company had major presence in numerous cities on the East coast and was one of the leading linen supply firms nationally 1986-Present National Trade Associations • Served as Director many times 1983-1986 Aramark Corporation • General Manager- Northeast Regional Manager Philadelphia, PA 1982-1983 • General Manager Unifirst Corporation Landover, MD 1974-1982 Carter Service Industries Inc. • Family Owned, East Coast Uniform Rental Company • Held many positions - General Manager • Sold to Unifrst 1982 NYSE corporation Landover, MD Charitable Endeavors Landon School - Bethesda, MD Lab School of Washington, DC St. Patrick's School, Washington, DC Adas Israel Congregation - Officer and Board of Managers Jewish Federation of Washington, DC Georgia Tech - Named Room in New Management Building Sidwell Friends School, Washington, DC Jelleff's Boys Club, Washington, DC Various Georgetown Area Charities - Contributed, Hosted many fund Raisers - including Rose Park, Volta Park, Georgetown Sr. Association, Leukemia Society, Lab School, Georgetown Ministries 2013 - Shemtov Award Adas Israel Congregation 2012 - Georgetown Ministries Honoree 2011- Yachad Honoree Middle Atlantic PGA- Sponsored tournament many years Field of Dreams Founding Contributor Sponsor Northwest Little League Shirley Povisch Field- Founding Contributor-Bethesda, MD Greater Washington Board of Trade - Member, Committee Member Project 312 - I Have A Dream Board Member -Washington Nationals Youth Baseball Academy Board Member - First Tee of Washington, DC Executive Office of the Mayor -Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 211 | Washington, DC 20004 Alan S. Bubes Alan S. Bubes is a native Washingtonian and is a graduate of the Sidwell Friends School. After graduating college, he worked with his family’s business here in DC and then with Aramark Corporation in Philadelphia. In 1985, Mr. Bubes and his family purchased Linens of the Week, which was the former Arcade Sunshine/Palace Laundry, a Washington, DC institution, which was located on Lamont Street in Columbia Heights. Mr. Bubes served as President/CEO for over 30 years until the sale of the company in 2012. Linens of the Week grew into one of the largest linen supply companies in the country with numerous facilities throughout the East serving the restaurant and hospitality industry. Linens of the Week always remained true to its roots with its headquarters and laundry facility always remaining in the District. At its main plant and headquarters on Lamont Street, it employed 250 local associates and over 900 nationwide. Mr. Bubes and his family previously developed the Linens of the Week site into a multi-family condo/apartment development with over 200 units with construction that began in 2016. Mr. Bubes has many other business interests and has been involved in, supports, and on the boards of many local philanthropic organizations. Among his many passions, his number one passion has always been Washington, DC sports. He and his family have been lifelong fans and season ticket holders of all of the major Washington sports teams. He still attends numerous sporting events for all of the teams every year. A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Bubes has a Bachelor of Science degree in Industrial Management from Georgia Institute of Technology in Atlanta, GA. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724 -7681 To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: December 12, 2023 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Alan Bubes and Brian Kenner as members and Leif Dormsjo as a member and chairperson of the Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above- referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202 - 724-1303, or me at 202- 724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish