District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0611 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/17/2024

                    January 17, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004-3003 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
District of Columbia Housing Authority 
300 7th Street, SW I 10th Floor 
Washington, DC 20024 
[202) 535-1000 I dchousing.org 
Executive Director, Keith Pettigrew 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code §2-352.02, 	I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council 	of the District of 
Columbia, the (a) Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long-Term Subsidy Contract 
("ALTSC") between the District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and Hope View Apartments LP 
("Owner"), and (b) Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A Approval Resolution 
of 2024. 
DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner in the initial amount 
of $232,536 annually for a multi-year 
term 
of fifteen (15) years, in support 	of the District's Local Rent Supplement Program to provide affordable housing 
units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE. 
As always, 
I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed AL TSC. In order to 
facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact my Chief 
of Staff, Alethea 
McNair, at (202) 993-8190. 
I look forward to your favorable consideration 	of this proposed ALTSC agreement. 
Sincerely, 
Keith Pettigrew 
Executive Director, District 
of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
KP/hg 
cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
34 
35 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
~~ 
Chairman Phil Mendels	on 
at the request of District of 
Columbia Housing Authority 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 	15 years in support of the 
District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable 
housing units for Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A with Hope View Apartments 
LP for 
program units at Hope View Apartments located at 1337 Good Hope Road, SE. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited 
as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2024-LRSP-02A 
with Hope View Apartments LP Approval Resolution 
of 2024". 
Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II 
of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support 
Act 
of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income 
households in the District. The passage 
of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program 
("LRSP"), a program designed 
to provide affordable housing and supportive services to 
extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or 
in need of 
supportive services, such 	as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based, 
tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the 
District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") 	to administer the LRSP on behalf 	of the 
District. 
{0030893 
-} 1   
 
 
 
{0030893 - }2 
 
(b) In September of 2021	, the District of Columbia’s Department of Housing and 1 
Community Development (“DHCD”), issued a Consolidated Request for Proposals for 2 
Affordable Housing Projects (RFP”) regarding the availability of funds from multiple District 3 
agencies, including D	CHA, DHCD, the Department of Behavioral Health, the Department of 4 
Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency. Of the t hirty (30) total 5 
proposals received, e	leven (11) developers were chosen to work with DCHA and other District 6 
agencies to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units for extremely 7 
low-income families making zero to t	hirty percent (30%) of the area’s median income, as well as 8 
the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities. Upon approval of 9 
the contract by the Council, DCHA will enter into an a	greement to enter into a l ong-term subsidy 10 
contract (“ALTSC”) with the selected housing providers under the LRSP for housing services.  11 
(c) There exists an immediate need to approve the l ong term subsidy contract with H ope 12 
View Apartments LP under the LRSP in order to provide long-	term affordable housing units for 13 
extremely low-income households for u	nits located at 1337 G ood Hope Road, SE. 14 
 (d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an A	LTSC between the District 15 
of Columbia Housing Authority and Hope View Apartments LP with respect to the payment of a 16 
rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Hope View Apartments and 17 
house extremely low-income households with incomes at thirty percent (30%) or less of the area 18 
median income.  19 
 Sec. 3.  Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Ho	me Rule Act, approved 20 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.51), and section 202 of the 21 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-	371; D.C. 22 
Official Code § 2-	352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Hope View Apartments LP 23   
 
 
 
{0030893 - }3 
 
to provide an operating subsidy in support sixteen (16) affordable housing units in an initial 1 
amount not to exceed $	232,536 annually.  2 
 Sec. 4. Transmittal.  3 
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 4 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.  5 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.  6 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 7 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 8 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).  9 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  10 
This resolution shall take effect immediately. 11