District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0625 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
 
25-428 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 6, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Legalization of 
Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which 
existing cultivation centers and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for 
additional medical cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold 
an internet retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants 
that tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between 
November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to 
provide that other cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 
150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to 
the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during the same open application period be 
considered for a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center 
and dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the 
location of its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to provide a deadline date by which existing 
cultivation centers and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for additional 
medical cannabis facility licenses, increase medical cannabis product availability to prohibit a 
cultivation center from also holding an internet retailer license, provide that the 2 cultivation 
center registration applicants that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to 
the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board (“ABC Board”) between November 29, 2021 and March 
28, 2022 (“open application period”) that tied for second and received the same score be awarded 
a cultivation center registration, and provide that other cultivation center and dispensary 
registration applicants that scored 150 points or more after submitting a cultivation center or 
dispensary application to the ABC Board during the same open application period to be 
considered for a cultivation center or retailer registration.      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
(b) In April 2023, the Council enacted legislation to address the above-mentioned issues.  
The temporary, the Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental Temporary Amendment Act of 
2023, effective July 20, 2023 (D.C. Law 25-31; 70 DCR 7924) (“temporary act”), expires on 
March 1, 2024.  
(c) Comprehensive permanent legislation addressing these issues has been introduced but 
must complete the legislative process. 
(d) It is of vital importance that the provisions of the temporary act continue in effect 
until the permanent legislation has become law.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Clarification 
Supplemental Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.