������� ���� ��� ������ ��-�*�B�E�)�B�I�K ����K �����K ��? �> �?�B�)�*�;�-�K �%�7�8�;�K �"�- �> �, �-�;�C�?�>�K ��7�)�8�B�=�)�>�K � �?�E�>�+�8�;�K �?�.�K �D �7�-�K ��8�C�D�B�8�+�D�K �?�.�K ��?�;�E�=�*�8�)�K ��?�7�>�K ���K �(�8�;�C�?�>�K ��E�8�;�,�8�>�6�K �����K �%�-�>�>�C�I�;�F�)�>�8�)�K ��F�-�>�E �-��K �#�(��K �& �E�8�D�-�K ����K �( �) �C �7�8�>�6�D�?�>��K � � �K������K � �-�)�B�K ��7�)�8�B�=�)�>�K �" �-�>�, �-�; �C�?�> ��K ��>�+�;�?�C�-�,�K�.�?�B�K�+�?�>�C�8�,�-�B�)�D�8�?�>�K�)�>�,�K�-�> �)�+�D�=�-�>�D�K�*�I�K�D�7�-�K��?�E�>�+�8�;�K�?�.�K�D�7�-�K��8�C�D�B�8�+�D�K�?�.�K��?�;�E�=�*�8�)�K�8�C�K�)�>�K �-�=�-�B�6�-�>�+�I�K�*�8�;�;��K �D�7�-�K“��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�#�?��K��(�������K�G�8�D�7�K���K� �8�>�6�C�K��)�B�@�-�D�K��;�-�)�>�8�>�6��K�!�!��K��@�@�B�?�F�)�;�K�)�>�, �%�)�I�=�-�>�D�K��E�D�7�?�B�8�J�)�D�8�?�>�K��=�-�B�6�-�>�+�I�K��+�D�K�?�.�K�����”�K�)�>�,�K�D�7�-�K�)�+�+�?�=�@�)�>�I�8�>�6�K�-�=�-�B�6�-�>�+�I�K�,�-�+�;�)�B�)�D�8�?�> �B�-�C�?�;�E�D�8�?�>� �'�7�-�K�;�-�6�8�C�;�)�D�8�?�>�K�G �8�;�;�K�)�@�@�B�?�F�-�K��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�#�?��K��(�������K�G�8�D�7�K���K� �8�>�6�C�K��)�B�@�-�D�K��;�-�)�>�8�>�6��K�!�!��K�.�?�B�K �-�=�-�B�6�-�>�+�I�K�,�-�-�@�K�+�;�-�)�>�8�>�6�K�)�>�,�K�C�)�>�8�D�8�J�8�>�6�K�C�-�B�F�8�+�-�C�K�.�?�B�K�=�8�6�B�)�>�D�K�.�)�=�8�;�8�-�C�K�)�>�,�K�8�>�,�8�F�8�,�E�)�;�C�K�)�B�B�8�F�8�>�6�K �.�B�?�=�K�D�7�-�K��B�8�J�?�>�) ��"�-�H�8�+�?�K�)�>�,�K�'�-�H�)�C��"�-�H�8�+�?�K�*�?�B�,�-�B�C��K�)�>�,�K�"�?�,�8�.�8�+�)�D�8�?�>�C�K���K���K���K���K��K�)�>�,�K� �D�7�-�B�-�D�?��K�K��>�K�)�,�,�8�D�8�?�>��K�D�7�-�K�;�-�6�8�C�;�)�D�8�?�>�K�G�8�;�;�K�)�@�@�B�?�F�-�K�@�)�I�=�-�>�D�K�.�?�B�K�D �7�-�K�6�?�?�,�C�K�)�>�,�K�C�-�B�F�8�+�-�C�K�B�-�+�-�8�F�-�,�K �)�>�,�K�D�?�K�*�-�K�B�-�+�-�8�F �-�,�K�E�>�,�-�B�K�D�7�-�K�+�?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�)�>�,�K�D�7�-�K�=�?�,�8�.�8�+�)�D�8�?�>�C� �"�I�K�)�,�=�8�>�8�C�D�B�)�D�8�?�>�K�8�C�K�)�F�)�8�;�)�*�;�-�K�D �?�K�,�8�C�+�E�C�C�K�)�>�I�K�A�E�-�C�D�8�?�>�C�K�I�?�E�K�=�)�I�K�7�)�F�-�K�B�-�6�)�B�,�8�>�6�K�D�7�-�K�+�?�>�D�B�)�+�D�K�)�>�,�K �=�?�,�8�.�8�+�)�D�8�?�>�C��K��> �K�?�B�,�-�B�K�D�?�K�.�)�+�8�;�8�D�)�D�-�K�)�K�B�-�C�@�?�>�C�-�K�D�?�K�)�>�I�K�A�E�-�C�D�8�?�>�C�K�I�?�E�K�=�)�I�K�7�)�F�-��K�@�;�-�)�C�-�K�7�)�F�-�K�I�?�E�B�K �C�D�)�.�.�K�+�?�>�D�)�+�D�K�"�) �B�+�K�&�+�?�D�D��K��7�8�-�.�K�$�@�-�B�)�D�8�>�6�K�$�.�.�8�+�-�B��K�$�.�.�8�+�-�K�?�.�K��?�>�D�B�)�+�D�8�>�6�K�)�>�,�K�%�B�?�+�E�B�-�=�-�>�D��K�)�D�K ����� ��������� ��K�E�B�6�-�K�D�7�-�K��?�E�>�+�8�;�K�D�?�K�D�)�:�-�K�@�B�?�=�@�D �K�)�>�,�K�.�)�F�?�B�)�*�;�-�K�)�+�D�8�?�>�K�?�>�K�D�7�-�K�-�>�+�;�?�C�-�,�K�;�-�6�8�C�;�)�D�8�?�>� 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 pjf#',ld-- Chairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 and 7 thereto, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the "Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024". Sec. 2. (a) There exists a need to approve Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 and 7 thereto, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. (b) On November 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement ("OCP"), on behalf of the Department of Human Services, executed Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC for emergency janitorial services for migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas -Mexico borders with a base 1 2 period of November 1, 2022 through S eptember 30, 2023 i n the not-to-exceed amount of 34 $2,500,000. 35 (c) Modification No. 1, increased the not-to-exceed amount of the base period of 36 the contract by $2,000,00 0, to a total not-to-exceed amount of $4,500,000. 37 (d) Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification. 38 (e) By Modification No. 3, OCP, extended the base period by one month to 39 October 31, 2023, at no cost to the District. 40 (f) By Modification No. 4, dated November 1, 2023, the Office of Contracting 41 and Procurement, on be half of the Department of Human Services, exercised a part of 42 option year 1 of Contract No. CW10 3327 f or the period November 1, 2023 through 43 February 14, 2024, i n the not-to-exceed amount $950,000. 44 (g) Modification No. 5 is now necessary to exercise t he remainder of option year 45 1 for the period February 15, 2024 through O ctober 31, 2024 i n the not-to-exceed amount 46 of $3,445,916, t hereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option year 1 to 47 $4,395,916. 48 (h) Modification No. 6 replaced the price s chedule in its entirety and deleted 49 option two and three price schedule. 50 (i) Modification No. 7 e xtended the option period from February 14, 2024 t o 51 March 8, 2024 a t no cost to the District. 52 (j) Under section 451(b) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 53 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51(b)) (1), Council 54 approval is necessary since t he base period and the modifications are both in excess $1 55 million during separate 12 -month periods . 56 3 (k) Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services. 57 Without this approval, II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC cannot be paid for goods and 58 services provided in excess of $1 m illion for the contract period N ovember 1, 2022 59 through O ctober 31, 2023 or the contract period November 1, 2023 thro ugh October 31, 60 2024. 61 Sec. 3. The Council determines th at the circumstances enumerated in section 2 62 constitute emergency circumstances making it neces sary that the Contract No. 63 CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning , LLC Approval and Payment Authorizati on 64 Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 65 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 66