District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0667 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-443  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
March 5, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. 
CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 
6, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under 
the contract and modifications.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC 
Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW103327 with II 
Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 and to authorize payment 
for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. 
(b)  On November 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement (“OCP”), on 
behalf of the Department of Human Services, executed Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings 
Carpet Cleaning, LLC for emergency janitorial services for migrant families and individuals 
arriving from the Arizona- Mexico and Texas – Mexico borders with a base period of November 
1, 2022 through September 30, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $2,500,000.   
(c) Modification No. 1, increased the not-to-exceed amount of the base period of the 
contract by $2,000,000, to a total not-to-exceed amount of $4,500,000. 
(d)  Modification No. 2 was an administrative modification.  
(e)  By Modification No. 3, OCP, extended the base period by one month to October 31, 
2023, at no cost to the District.   
(f)  By Modification No. 4, dated November 1, 2023, OCP, on behalf of the Department 
of Human Services, exercised a part of option year 1 of Contract No. CW103327 for the period 
November 1, 2023 through February 14, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount $950,000. 
(g)  Modification No. 5 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option year 1 for 
the period February 15, 2024 through October 31, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of 
$3,445,916, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount for option year 1 to $4,395,916. 
(h) Modification No. 6 deleted section B.3 (Price Schedule) in its entirety and replaced it 
with revised section B.3, as can be seen in Attachment A to the concomitant legislation (Bill 25-   	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
706) submitted to the Office of the Secretary on February 28, 2024. The Option year two and 
three price schedules are deleted in their entirety. 
(i)  Under section 451 of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), Council 
approval is necessary as the base period and the modifications are both in excess $1 million 
during separate 12-month periods.   
  (j)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without this 
approval, II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC cannot be paid for goods and services provided in 
excess of $1 million for the contract period November 1, 2022 through October 31, 2023, or the 
contract period November 1, 2023 through October 31, 2024. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings 
Carpet Cleaning, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted 
after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.