District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0675 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2024

                     	1 
                                                                                                                                          1 
                                   ______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
                        6 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 
_________________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
_________________________ 11 
 12 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue the 13 
extension of the Streatery Program through 2024 and to clarify endorsement 14 
deadlines for certain classes of licensees. 15 
 16 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 17 
this resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline 18 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 19 
 20 
Sec. 2. (a) The Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation 21 
Amendment Act of 2022, effective June 30, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-127; 69 DCR 507), 22 
allowed Alcoholic Beverage Control Board (“Board”) licensed establishments that 23 
registered with the Board to offer beer, wine, or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor 24 
space (“Streatery Program”) until December 31, 2023.   25 
      (b) The District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) extended the Streatery 26 
Program deadline through December 31, 2024, to allow DDOT more time to develop 27 
regulations and guidelines needed to facilitate a permanent Streatery Program, and, in 28 
December 2023, the Council enacted legislation, which likewise extended the Streatery 29 
Program but did not clarify the deadlines by which specific licensees must pay their 30 
annual fees. The December 2023 emergency will expire on March 20, 2024. 31 
    (c) It is necessary to amend current law to clarify that while most alcohol licensees 32 
are required to make their annual payment this year by April 1, 2024, the annual payment 33   	2 
for taverns, nightclubs, and breweries is due on September 30, 2024.   34 
     (d) To avoid confusion as a result of having multiple deadlines and to ensure 35 
administrative efficiency and a customer-friendly process, it is necessary that new 36 
legislation that continues the Streatery Program extension but that also clarifies that 37 
breweries, taverns, and nightclubs can pay their Streatery Program fee for 2024 at the 38 
same time that their annual liquor license fee is due be enacted. 39 
     (e) It is of vital importance that the clarifying provisions of the Streatery Program 40 
and Endorsement Deadline Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be enacted 41 
as soon as possible. 42 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 43 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program and 44 
Endorsement Deadline Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 45 
reading. 46 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 47