District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0675 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-450  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
March 5, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue the extension of 
the Streatery Program through 2024 and to clarify endorsement deadlines for certain 
classes of licensees. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) The Reopen Washington DC Alcoholic Beverage Regulation Amendment Act 
of 2022, effective June 30, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-127; 69 DCR 507), allowed Alcoholic Beverage 
Control Board (“Board”) licensed establishments that registered with the Board to offer beer, 
wine, or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space (“Streatery Program”) until December 31, 
2023.   
      (b) The District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) extended the Streatery Program 
deadline through December 31, 2024, to allow DDOT more time to develop regulations and 
guidelines needed to facilitate a permanent Streatery Program, and, in December 2023, the 
Council enacted legislation, which likewise extended the Streatery Program but did not clarify 
the deadlines by which specific licensees must pay their annual fees. The December 2023 
emergency will expire on March 20, 2024. 
    (c) It is necessary to amend current law to clarify that while most alcohol licensees are 
required to make their annual payment this year by April 1, 2024, the annual payment for 
taverns, nightclubs, and breweries is due on September 30, 2024.   
     (d) To avoid confusion as a result of having multiple deadlines and to ensure 
administrative efficiency and a customer-friendly process, it is necessary that new legislation that 
continues the Streatery Program extension but that also clarifies that breweries, taverns, and 
nightclubs can pay their Streatery Program fee for 2024 at the same time that their annual liquor 
license fee is due be enacted. 
     (e) It is of vital importance that the clarifying provisions of the Streatery Program and 
Endorsement Deadline Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be enacted as soon as 
possible.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program and Endorsement 
Deadline Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.