District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0678 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/04/2024

                     
1 
 
_____________________________   _____________________________ 1 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie        Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
 3 
          4 
   5 
 6 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 
 8 
_________________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
______________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Fair Meals 17 
Delivery Act of 2022 to modify the requirements of third-party meal delivery platforms. 18 
 19 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
resolution may be cited as the “Food Delivery Fees Transparency Emergency Declaration 21 
Resolution of 2024”. 22 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 6, 2023, the Council passed the Food Delivery Fees Transparency 23 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective August 17, 2023 (D.C. Law 25-38; 70 DCR 24 
9412) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is set to expire on March 29, 2024.  25 
(b) On February 6, 2024, the Council passed on first reading the Restaurant 26 
Revitalization and Dram Shop Clarification Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 1st reading on 27 
February 6, 2024 (Engrossed version of Bill 25-56). The bill incorporates the provisions in the 28 
temporary act and will have its second reading on March 5, 2024. 29 
(c) The provisions of this emergency legislation are identical to the provisions in the 30 
Restaurant Revitalization and Dram Shop Clarification Amendment Act of 2024 and will prevent 31 
a gap in the law as the Council simultaneously advances the permanent legislation.  32   
2 
 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 33 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Food 34 
Delivery Fees Transparency Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 35 
reading. 36 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37