District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0705 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/02/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-459  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
April 2, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to 
provide that it is unlawful for a licensed or unlicensed cultivation center, manufacturer, 
retailer, or internet retailer to represent that goods or services or the business is compliant 
with the Legalization of Possession of Minimal Amounts of Marijuana for Personal Use 
Initiative of 2014, to authorize the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board to extend the 
45-calendar day public comment period by an additional 30-calendar days in response to 
a written request submitted by either an affected Advisory Neighborhood Commission or 
the applicant, to clarify that an Advisory Neighborhood Commission within 600 feet of 
where an establishment is or will be located has standing to protest the issuance of a 
license to an unlicensed cultivation center, manufacturer, retailer, or internet retailer, to 
align the enforcement procedures with those provided in Title 25 of the District of 
Columbia Official Code, and to clarify that the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board 
has the authority to issue cease-and-desist orders mandating compliance with the 
provisions of the Medical Cannabis Program; and to amend the Medical Cannabis 
Amendment Act of 2022 to clarify that the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board has 
authority to enforce against commercial property owners of properties that are used to 
operate illegal cannabis businesses. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Program Enforcement Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On January 9, 2024, the Council passed the Medical Cannabis Program 
Enforcement Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective January 25, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-371; 
71 DCR 1200) (“emergency act”). The emergency act will expire on April 24, 2024.  
(b) On February 6, 2024, the Council passed the Medical Cannabis Program Enforcement 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, enacted on February 22, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-396; 71 DCR 
2082) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is currently undergoing congressional review.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
(c) To prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of the emergency act and the 
effective date of the temporary act, it is now necessary to pass this congressional review 
emergency legislation.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Program Enforcement 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.