District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0732 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/25/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Ap
ril 25, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 2 	of the Commission on Fashion Arts and 
Events Establishment Act of 2008, effective April 15, 2008 (D.C. Law 17-148; D.C. Official Code 
§ 
3-651), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:
Ms. Maude Okrah 
Half Street, SW 
Washington, DC 20536 
(Ward 6) 
for reappointment as a member of t	he Commission on Fashion Arts and Events, fo
r a term to end April 
15, 2028. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
airman 
Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the reappointment of Maude Okrah to the Commission on Fashion Arts and Events. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Commission on Fashion Arts and Events Maude Okrah 
19 Confirmation Resolution of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Ms. Maude Okrah 
23 	Half Street, SW 
24 	Washington, 
DC 20536 
25 	(Ward 6) 
26 
27 
as a member of the Commission on Fashion Arts and Events, established by section 2 	of the 
28 Commission on Fashion Arts and Events Establishment Act 	of 2008, effective April 15, 2008 
29 (D.C. Law 17-148;_D.C. Official Code§ 3-651), for a term 
to end April 15, 2028. 
30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   MAUDE OKRAH- HUNTER
CONTACT
|
2
Cs
EDUCATION
EMERSONCOLLEGE
BachelorofScienceinMarketing
Minor:BroadcastJournalism
2005-2009
SKILLS
Marketing
Strategy
StrategicCommunications
CriticalThinking
ProjectManagement
GlobalBusinessDevelopment
StartUp
bbb
RECOGNITION
President'sCitationAward-EmersonCollege
ingCrashersAward-AT&T
FemaleStudentAthleteoftheYearAward
 
Women'sCs 
‘Who'sWhoofAmerica
WORK EXPERIENCE
cEO
BonntiInc.(2017-Present)
Beautytechcompanyfocusedonwomenofcolor.Ondemandhair
andmakeupservices.
FinancialLiteracyplatformforbeautyprofessionals
Notableclientportfolioincludes:Essence,Cond®Nast,WarnerBros.
CBS,BET,andEbony
FOUNDER
BlackBeautyRoster(2020-present)
ADEIplatformthatconnectstheTV&Film,FashionandBeautyindustry
witheducation,beautyprofessionals,andconsultingservices.
Partnershipgrowthwithleadingmedia,beauty,andfashion
companies.
Notablepartnersinclude:NBCU,AmazonStudios,L'Oreal,Warner
Bros.Discovery,Disney,Sephora,WME,
STRAGETGYADVISOR
ShellInternationalCompany(2009-2020)
AlternativeEnergyCommercializationAdvisor-responsiblefor
creatingstrategyandeconomicassessmentofAlternativeEnergy
portfolioforShell
GlobalBusinessDevelopmentManager-responsiblefor
developingandImplementingstrategyforbusinessgrowthIn15
differentcountries.   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Maude Okrah 
 
Ms. Maude Okrah is the Co-	Founder and CEO of Bonnti, Inc, a beauty 
technology company focused on women of color.  
Maude Okrah is an entrepreneur who is passionate about bringing 
solutions to underserved markets. She has over 12 years of experience 
working in Strategy and Global Business Development with Shell 
Energy International working with startups and Fortune 500 companies. 
She is co-founder of  Bonnti Inc. a beauty tech company focused on 
diversity and inclusion and serves as CEO of its  primary brand, Black 
Beauty Roster (BBR). BBR is a digital DE&I platform that connects the 
TV, Film, Fashion and Beauty industries with hairstylists and makeup 
artists trained in all textures and complexions while also increasing education to the industry at 
large. BBR has worked with industry leading companies like Warner Bros. Discovery, Walt 
Disney, L’Oreal, Amazon, IMG and more. She has been featured in Forbes, Inc, Variety, 
Hollywood Reporter, Allure, and Insider.   
A Ward 7 resident, Ms. Okrah earned her Bachelor of Arts in Marketing from Emerson College.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: April 10, 2024 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Jamila Galloway and Maude 
Okrah as members of the Commission on Fashion Arts and Events  
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish