District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0748 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/07/2024

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-496  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
May 7, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No. 
NFPHC-OPS-23-C-00059 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation, commonly 
known as United Medical Center, and Morrison Management Specialists, Inc., to 
provider food and nutrition management services, and to authorize payment for the 
services received and to be received under the contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. NFPHC-OPS-23-C-00059 between the Not-for-
Profit Hospital Corporation and Morrison Management Specialists, Inc., Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. NFPHC-OPS-23-C-
00059 (“Contract”) between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation (“Hospital”) and Morrison 
Management Specialists, Inc. (“Morrison”) to provide food and nutrition management services to 
the Hospital and to authorize payment for the services received and to be received under this 
Contract.  
(b) As the Hospital moves rapidly toward closure, sole sourcing to incumbent vendors 
wherever possible and within fiscal limitations has become the preferred approach to stabilizing 
critical services without disrupting patient care.  Accordingly, when the prior engagement for 
these services approached expiration in July 2023, the Hospital selected the incumbent vendor, 
Morrison, as its preferred vendor for a new contract that would likely continue until the facility 
closes in early 2025. 
(c) To avoid a lapse in these critical services while also providing additional time for 
detailed negotiations of a new 12-month base contract, the Hospital sought to quickly execute a 
letter contract with Morrison. Despite the good faith and timely efforts of both parties, attempts 
to finalize early drafts of the letter contract were unsuccessful largely due to the Hospital’s 
looming wind-down and eventual closure. Fluctuating patient and staff volumes, higher vendor 
costs even for incumbents, and continuing fiscal limitations made service level and associated 
cost determinations extremely difficult. Morrisons’s change in leadership also contributed to the 
significant delay.     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
(d) The parties executed the letter contract on February 12, 2024, in the amount of 
$891,076, for a 7 month base period, from August 1, 2023 to February 29, 2024. 
(e) The parties subsequently completed negotiations for the remaining 5 months, from 
March 1, 2024 to July 31, 2024, in the amount of $636,483.22. 
(f) The proposed definitized base year of the Contract has a value of $1,527,560 and 
requires Council approval because the aggregate value exceeds $1 million in a 12-month period.  
(g) Without Council approval, Morrison cannot be paid for these critical services 
provided and to be provided in excess of $1 million. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Contract No. NFPHC-OPS-23-C-00059 
between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Morrison Management Specialists, Inc., 
Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.