District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0755 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/06/2024

                     	1 
                                                                                                   
_______________________________ 
                                 Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 1 
 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 
 8 
_______ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
____________________ 13 
 14 
To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect 15 
to the need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 16 
Initiative of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which existing cultivation centers 17 
and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for additional medical 18 
cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold an internet 19 
retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants that 20 
tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical 21 
cannabis facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board 22 
between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center 23 
registration, to provide that other cultivation center and dispensary registration 24 
applicants that scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis 25 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during 26 
the same open application period be considered for a cultivation center or retailer 27 
registration, and to allow a cultivation center and dispensary registration applicant 28 
that scored 150 points or more to change the location of its facility without 29 
otherwise affecting the status of its application. 30 
 31 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 32 
this resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental 33 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 34 
 35 
Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to provide a deadline date by which 36 
existing cultivation centers and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for 37 
additional medical cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold 38 
an internet retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants 39 
that tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis 40   	2 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between 41 
November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to 42 
provide that other cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 43 
150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to 44 
the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during the same open application period be 45 
considered for a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center 46 
and dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the 47 
location of its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application. 48 
(b) In February 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Clarification 49 
Supplemental Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective February 22, 2024 (D.C. 50 
Act 25-403; 71 DCR 2101), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical Cannabis 51 
Clarification Supplemental Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading 52 
on March 5, 2024 (Enrolled version Bill 25-679), (“temporary legislation”) to address the 53 
above-referenced needs. 54 
(c) The emergency legislation expires on May 22, 2024.  The temporary 55 
legislation must still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of 56 
the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; 57 
D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency 58 
legislation has expired. 59 
 (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in 60 
effect, without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect.  61 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 62 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis 63   	3 
Clarification Supplemental Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 64 
be adopted after a single reading. 65 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 66