District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0755 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/07/2024

                      ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-490  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
May 7, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency basis, due to congressional review, with respect 
to the need to amend the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 
Initiative of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which existing cultivation centers 
and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for additional medical 
cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold an internet 
retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants that 
tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical 
cannabis facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board 
between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center 
registration, to provide that other cultivation center and dispensary registration 
applicants that scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during 
the same open application period be considered for a cultivation center or retailer 
registration, and to allow a cultivation center and dispensary registration applicant 
that scored 150 points or more to change the location of its facility without 
otherwise affecting the status of its application. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 
this resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental 
Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There existed an immediate need to provide a deadline date by which 
existing cultivation centers and dispensaries must file their applications with ABCA for 
additional medical cannabis facility licenses, to not allow a cultivation center to also hold 
an internet retailer license, to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants 
that tied for second and received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis 
facility registration application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between 
November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to 
provide that other cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 
150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to 
the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board during the same open application period be 
considered for a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
and dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the 
location of its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application. 
(b) In February 2024, the Council enacted the Medical Cannabis Clarification 
Supplemental Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective February 22, 2024 (D.C. 
Act 25-403; 71 DCR 2101), (“emergency legislation”) and the Medical Cannabis 
Clarification Supplemental Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, passed on 2nd reading 
on March 5, 2024 (Enrolled version Bill 25-679), (“temporary legislation”) to address the 
above-referenced needs. 
(c) The emergency legislation expires on May 22, 2024.  The temporary 
legislation must still complete the 30-day review period required by section 602(c)(1) of 
the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and will not become law until after the emergency 
legislation has expired. 
 (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the emergency legislation continue in 
effect, without interruption, until the temporary legislation is in effect.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis 
Clarification Supplemental Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 
be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.