MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR May 22, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman M endelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 203 of the Green Finance Authority Establishment Act of 2018, effective August 22, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-155; D.C. Official Code § 8- 173.23), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: Mr. Todd Monash River R oad, NW Washington, DC 20016 (Ward 3 ) f or reappointment as a voting member with experience at a financial institution operating within the District of the Green Finance Authority Board, for a term to end July 9, 2027. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m entioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel B owser Mayor 1 2 airman Phil Mendelson 3 at the request of the Mayor 4 5 6 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 8 9 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 13 14 15 To confirm the reappointment of Todd Monash to the Green Finance Authority Board. 16 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 18 resolution may be cited as the "Green Finance Authority Board Todd Monash Confirmation 19 Resolution of 2024". 20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 21 22 Mr. Todd Monash 23 River Road, NW 24 Washington, DC 20016 25 (Ward 3) 26 27 as a voting member with experience at a financial institution operating within the District of the 28 Green Finance Authority Board, established by section 201 of the Green Finance Authority 29 Establishment Act of 2018, effective August 22, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-155; D.C. Official Code§ 30 8-173.21), for a term to end July 9, 2027. 31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, 32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. TODD MONASH PROFILE • 20 years experience in the commercial and residential lending markets as originator and analyst • Team manager with measured success • Extensive knowledge and business relationships in the Washington, DC metropolitan area • Fluent in English and Spanish EDUCATION The Risk Management Association 2014 Commercial Credit for Lenders Georgetown University, Washington, DC 1993 International Executive Graduate Program University of Notre Dame, South Bend, IN 1990 Bachelor of Science Degree in Biology and Philosophy EXPERIENCE April 2018 – Present United Bank, Tyson’s Corner, VA Commercial Services Officer • Asked to join the United Bank team following its acquisition of Cardinal Bank. • Originate Commercial & Industrial (C&I) and Real Estate loans in Washington, DC • Manage the Treasury Management and complete deposit relationship of a $500 million portfolio. • Successful in leading $76 million to the bank in 2018, assisting with its organic growth in the market • Lead on introducing Executive Team to area for-profit and not-for-profit organizations. • Member of Rate Planning Committee August 2014 – April 2018 Cardinal Bank, Tyson’s Corner, VA Commercial Services Officer • Originate Commercial & Industrial (C&I) and Real Estate loans in Washington, DC • Manage the Treasury Management and complete deposit relationship of a portfolio of $300 million • Present and Support commercial relationships to loan committee. Todd Monash Page 2 2010 – July 2014 TD Bank, Tyson’s Corner, VA Small Business Relationship Manager • Originate and secure Commercial & Industrial (C&I) and Real Estate loans throughout Greater Metropolitan DC market • Develop and manage business loan production business customer relationships at 14 branches • Coach branch managers in developing small business loan and deposit pipeline • Teach Financial Literacy with focus on preparing companies on Borrowing and credit preparedness to support Community Reinvestment Act requirements. 2000 - 2010 Bankers Fidelity Mortgage Corporation, Reston, VA Senior Loan Manager • Secured over $220M in refinance and purchase loans, working with over 50 different lenders • Worked with area lending institutions as alternative lender • Supervised team of loan officers to meet closing goals 1997 - 2000 Walker & Dunlop/Green Park Financial, Bethesda, MD Senior Analyst • Analyst for top producing Loan Originators • Analyzed debt-financing and loan-servicing of multifamily, retail and office properties in the Washington, DC metropolitan area. Properties valued between $1M to $450M • Presented loan packages to lenders on commercial real estate projects and properties for investors, owners, and developers • Conducted and presented research used to index debt, structure financing and equity execution for commercial real estate investors 1994 - 1997 Arthur Andersen, Washington, DC Real Estate Advisory Group Analyst • Developed analysis for packages presented to institutional investors for funding the development of toll road projects domestically and internationally (specifically in Virginia, Mexico and Panama markets) • Developed demographic studies and local economic growth analysis to project return on investment • Provided analysis and appraisal support of local commercial real estate portfolios Todd Monash Page 3 1991 - 1993 U.S. Asia Commercial Dev. Corp., Washington, DC Analyst • Provided custom analysis to support the efforts of U.S. real estate development and telecommunications companies entering their respective markets in Japan, South Korea and Taiwan • Provided logistical support and communication with Japanese and Korean companies at the senior executive level • Developed and implemented the company’s annual budget with the office in Seoul, South Korea • Reported to company COO 1990 - 1991 Tenley Study Center, Washington, DC English Immersion Program Coordinator and Teacher • Developed and supervised an English immersion program for 44 high school students from Spain • Program concentrations included the development of students’ conversational English skills through interactive tours in Washington, DC and New York City • Program studies focused on the U.S. political system ADDITIONAL EXPERIENCE 2001- 2010 River House Antiques, Washington, DC Partner • Partner in family owned retail antique furniture business with $450,00 annual gross sells • Managed inventory for start-up store and online company • Managed and performed h istoric restoration of period furniture from New England and Europe Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Todd Monash Mr. Todd Monash is Vice President and member of the United Bank Commercial Services team. Mr. Monash brings more than 20 years of banking and lending experience in this market as a commercial and residential lender and a relationship manager focusing on large commercial relationships for the bank. Mr. Monash has been an experienced commercial lender and relationship manager in the region for almost 20 years, helping businesses and organizations based in the Washington area achieve their goals. Before coming to United Bank in 2018, Mr. Monash was with Cardinal Bank, working with the development team to grow this $4 billion bank organically. A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Monash earned his bachelor’s in philosophy and biology from the University of Notre Dame and is a graduate of the International Executive Graduate Program at Georgetown University. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: May 15, 2024 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Deborah Loomis, Todd Monash, and Ricardo Nogueira as members of the Green Finance Authority Board This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202- 724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish