District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0840 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/04/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Ju
ne 4, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant 
to section 201 of the District of Columbia Health 
Occupations 
Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-
1202.01), I am pleased to nominate the following person:   
Dr. Eric Brad
shaw 
New Hampshire Avenue, NE 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4) 
for appointment as a dentist licensed in the District member of the Board of Dentistry, filling a vacant 
seat formerly 
held by Dr. Judith Henry, for the remainder of an unexpired term to end November 30, 
2026.  
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
#:.~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To confirm the appointment 
of Dr. Eric Bradshaw to the Board 	of Dentistry. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
resolution may be cited as the "Board 
of Dentistry Dr. Eric Bradshaw Confirmation Resolution 
of 2024". 
Sec. 
2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 
Dr. Eric Bradshaw 
New Hampshire A venue, NE 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4) 
as a dentist licensed in the District member 
of the Board of Dentistry, established by section 	201 
of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act 	of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 
(D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official 
Code§ 3-1202.01), filling a vacant seat formerly held by Dr. 
Judith Henry, for the remainder 
of an unexpired term to end November 30, 2026. 
Sec. 
3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 
of the Mayor. 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Dr. Eric Bradshaw 
 
Dr. Eric Bradshaw is a life-long resident of Washington, 	DC, having 
lived in Wards 4, 5, 7 and 8. He attended Leckie Elementary, Jefferson 
Junior H igh School and Banneker High School.  
 
In 2013, he and his partner started a group private dental 	practice, which 
has grown to three 	locations in Washington, DC and Silver Spring, MD. 
He is also a member of Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc. 
 
A Ward 4 resident, Dr. Bradshaw earned his Bachelor of Science in 
Business Management from North Carolina Agricultural and Technical 
State University, his Master of Business Administration from 
Southeastern University, and his Doctor of Dental Surgery from Howard University. 
   ERICM.BRADSHAW SR,DDS,MBA
es
LT
LT
ee
 
Topositivelyimpactmylocalcommunity,theDentalcommunityandthosewhodesiretolearntheart
andscienceofDentistry.
EXPERIENCE
2014-PRESENT
FOUNDINGPARTNER,MINTDENTALDC
‘Own,operateandmanageasuccessfulmulit-locationDentalpractice.Coachandmentorteam.
2014-2016
ADJUNCTFACULTY,HOWARDUNIVERSITY
Establishandoperateanew,grant-based,DentalclinicatDunbarSeniorHighSchoolin
Washington,DC.
2012-2013
GENERALDENTISTASSOCIATE,DANAC.JACKSON,DDS&ASSOCIATES
ProvideservicestopatientsinallaspectsofGeneralDentistrywithinanOralSurgeryand
Orthodonticsgrouppractice.
2011-2021
GUESTLECTURER,AEGD—HOWARDUNIVERSITY
LectureAEGD/GPRresidentsonPracticeManagement—BusinessSkills.
2009-2012
GENERALDENTISTASSOCIATE,WILLIAME.KELSON,DDS&ASSOCIATES
ProvideservicestopatientsinallaspectsofGeneralDentistrywithinprivatepractice,innursing
homesandrehabilitationfacilities.
EDUCATION,
2009-2010
ADVANCEDEDUCATIONINGENERALDENTISTRYCERTIFICATE
HOWARDUNIVERSITYCOLLEGEOFDENTISTRY
2005-2009
DOCTOROFDENTALSURGERY
HOWARDUNIVERSITYCOLLEGEOFDENTISTRY
PassedNBDEPart|andIlonfirstattempt,2007&2009respectively
Passed5partsofNERBexamonfirstattempt,2008-2009   2003-2005
PRE-DENTALCOURSES
UNIVERSITYOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA
2000-2001
MASTEROFBUSINESSADMINISTRATION—BUSINESSMANAGEMENT
SOUTHEASTERNUNIVERSITY
1990-1994
BACHELOROFSCIENCE—BUSINESSMANAGEMENT
NCA&TSTATEUNIVERSITY
 
MEMBERSHIPS
‘*DCDentalSocietyNewMembersCommittee—Member2022—present
'*DentalEntrepreneurOrganization2021—present
‘©DCAcademyofGeneralDentistry2019-2020
'®GreaterWashingtonAcademyofDentalStudies(SeattleStudyClub)2017—present
‘©Nation'sCapitalDentalStudyClub2016-2018
'*AmericanDentalAssociation2015—present
'*DCDentalSociety2015-present
‘AmericanAssociationofPediatricDentistsStudentMember2008~2009
‘*AmericanStudentDentalAssociation(ASDA)Member2005~2009
'*StudentNationalDentalAssociation(SNDA)Member2005-2007
POST-DOCTORAL ACTIVITIES
JamaicaDentalMissiontrip2019
PurelandProject(Tibet)DentalMissiontrip2018
Washington,DCMissionofMercy2015
SouthernMarylandMissionofMercy2012
PRE-DOCTORAL ACTIVITIES
D4RestorativeDentistryDeptRepresentative2008-2009
EveningClinicStudentDentist2007—2009
D3ClassPresident2007
3EndodonticsLectureRepresentative2007
D2Orthodontics/PedodonticsLabRepresentative2007
SNDAImpressionsProgramCommitteeMember2006-2008
ASDATreasurer2006~2007
D2PeriodonticsLecture/LabRepresentative2006
D1ClassSNDARepresentative2005~2006  3 
AWARDS 
Leadership in Community Based Programs Award, 2008 
Pre-Clinical Fixed Prosthodontic and Operative Dentistry Award, 2007  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   May 13, 2024 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Dr. Jonelle Anamelechi and 
Dr. Eric Bradshaw as members of the Board of Dentistry   
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and 
found it to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish