District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0843 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/07/2024

                    1 
 
 
_______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 2 
 3 
 4 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION  5 
________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
 9 
______________________ 10 
 11 
 12 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Walter Reed 13 
Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues received from the 14 
Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed Land and 15 
Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into the Walter Reed 16 
Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or reimburse certain 17 
costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the Walter Reed 18 
Redevelopment Site. 19 
 20 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 21 
may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Emergency Declaration Resolution 22 
of 2024”. 23 
 Sec. 2. (a) On September 19, 2023, the Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed 24 
Development Assistance Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, effective November 28, 2023 (D.C. 25 
Act 25-0226; 70 DCR 013752), which is scheduled to expire on October 31, 2023.  26 
(b) To avoid an imminent lapse in the law between the expiration of the temporary act and 27 
the effective date of the permanent act, through the Fiscal Year 2025 Budget Support Act of 2024, 28 
it is necessary to pass emergency legislation.  29 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 30 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter Reed Development Assistance 31 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading.  32  2 
 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 33