District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0856 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/11/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Ju
ne 11, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant 
to section 210 of the District of Columbia Health 
Occupations 
Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-
1202.10) I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw 
Peabody S treet, NE 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4 )
 
f
or appointment as a podiatrist licensed in the District member of the Board of Podiatry, filling a vacant 
seat formerly held by Michangelo Scruggs, f
or the remainder of an unexpired term to end April 16, 
2026. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
33 
~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To confirm the appointment 
of Kevin Cornell Bradshaw to the Board 	of Podiatry. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
resolution may be cited as the "Board 
of Podiatry Kevin Cornell Bradshaw Confirmation 
Resolution 
of 2024". 
Sec. 
2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 
Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw 
Peabody Street, NE 
Washington, DC 20011 
(Ward 4) 
as a podiatrist licensed in the District member 
of the Board of Podiatry, established by section 
210 
of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act 	of 1985, effective March 25, 
1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official 
Code§ 3-1202.10), filling a vacant seat formerly held by 
Michangelo Scruggs, for the remainder 
of an unexpired term to end April 16, 2026. 
Sec. 
3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 
of the Mayor. 
Sec. 
4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.    
PROFILE
lamaNativeWashingtonianwitha
missiontohelppeople.Wisthasolo
practiceinPodiatry,|havebeenin
practiceforovertwentyyears,with
aconcentrationonhomeHealth
care.|amaHouseCallDoctor,and|
loveit!Ihavehadanincredible
opportunitytohelppeoplefrom
everysectionoftheDistrictof
Columbia,andfromeverysocial-
economicstratum.Thishasgiven
meauniqueandinteresting
practice.
CONTACT
 
HOBBIES
ModelBuilding
StudyingHistory
Gaming
Gardening
KCORNELL
BRADSHAW
Podiatrist
EDUCATION
OhioCollegeofPodiatricMedicineNKAKentStateSchoolof
Podiatry
1987-1991
FiskUniversity
1982-1986
WORKEXPERIENCE
SoloPrac
2012-Present
PracticecenteredinHomeHealthCare.Mypracticeservespatients
thatareunabletotraveltoseekpodiatriccare,Mostofthepatients
thatIsawhadadditionalmorbiditiessuchasDiabetes,
Cardiovascularpathologies,andothervariouspathologythatmade
traveldifficultforthepatient.
 joner,Podiatrist
 
GroupPractitioner,AssociatePodiatrist
2009-2011
BroadcarepracticeinallaspectsofPodiatricMedicine.Wesawa
trulydiversegroupofpatientsthatvisitedforawiderangeofcare
frompalliativecare,woundcare,andsurgicalcare.
 
2002-2008
GeneralPracticeinPodiatry,concentratingonpalliativecare,
biomechanicalassessments,sportsinjuries,anddermatologic
pathology.   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw 
 
Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw is a Native Washingtonian with a mission 
to help people. Dr. Bradshaw has a solo practice in podiatry 	and has 
been in practice for over twenty years, with 	a concentration on home 
health care.  
As a house call doctor, Dr. Bradshaw enjoys the opportunity to help 
people from every section of the District of Columbia, and from every 
social-economic stratum. His practice serves patients that are unable to 
travel to seek podiatric care. Most of the patients that he sees have 
additional morbidities such as diabetes, 	cardiovascular pathologies, and 
other various pathologies that make travel difficult for patients. 
A Ward 4 resident, Dr	. Bradshaw earned his Bachelor of Science in Chemistry from Fisk 
University and his Doctor of Podiatry from the Ohio College of Podiatric Medicine. 
 
  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   May 31, 2024 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw 
as a member of the Board of Podiatry 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and 
found it to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish