District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0875 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/25/2024

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-531  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 25, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Condominium Act of 1976 to authorize condominium unit owners’ 
associations to conduct virtual meetings and to clarify voting and quorum requirements 
for such meetings; and to amend section 29-910 of the District of Columbia Official Code 
to allow cooperatives to conduct remote meetings. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On April 15, 2024, the Mayor signed into effect the Association Meeting 
Flexibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, which maintains flexibility for condominium 
and cooperative associations to conduct their meetings virtually without the need to amend their 
bylaws. This emergency legislation is due to expire on July 14, 2024.  
(b) On May 29, 2024, the Mayor signed an identical temporary measure, the Association 
Meeting Flexibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024. Due to congressional review, the 
projected law date for this temporary legislation is August 1, 2024.  
(c) Emergency legislation is necessary to avoid a lapse in the law.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
an emergency making it necessary that the Association Meeting Flexibility Congressional 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.