District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0883 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/24/2024

                     	1 
  1 
_______________________ 2 
                       Councilmember Brooke Pinto 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 
 8 
________ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
________________ 13 
 14 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 15 
the need to amend An Act To create a Department of Corrections in the District of 16 
Columbia and the Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 17 
2022 to designate the Department of Corrections as the District agency to provide 18 
a free appropriate public education under the Individuals with Disabilities 19 
Education Act and District law to certain individuals in its custody and detained 20 
in its secure facilities. 21 
 22 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 23 
this resolution may be cited as the “Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody 24 
of the Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Declaration 25 
Resolution of 2024”. 26 
 Sec. 2.  (a) On April 2, 2024, the Council passed the Special Education for Young 27 
Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 28 
2024, effective April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-446; 71 DCR 4635) (“emergency act”), 29 
which expires July 14, 2024.  30 
 (b) On May 7, 2024, the Council also passed the Special Education for Young 31 
Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 32 
2024, enacted April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-485; 71 DCR 6760) (“temporary act”). The 33   	2 
temporary act is currently undergoing congressional review and has a projected law date 34 
of December 6, 2024. 35 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 36 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 37 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 38 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 39 
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections 40 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 41 
reading. 42 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43